Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 05/21/1982
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 05/21/1982
Rep. Derwinski, Edward J. [R-IL-4] 05/25/1982
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 06/14/1982
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 06/16/1982
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 06/16/1982
Rep. Railsback, Thomas F. [R-IL-19] 06/24/1982
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [D-FL-8] 06/24/1982
Rep. Washington, Harold [D-IL-1] 06/24/1982
Rep. Bailey, Donald A. [D-PA-21] 06/24/1982
Rep. Mollohan, Robert H. [D-WV-1] 06/24/1982
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 06/24/1982
Rep. Rostenkowski, Dan [D-IL-8] 06/24/1982
Rep. Atkinson, Eugene V. [D-PA-25] 06/24/1982
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 07/14/1982
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 07/14/1982
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/14/1982
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 07/14/1982
Rep. Hall, Sam B., Jr. [D-TX-1] 07/14/1982
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-2] 07/14/1982
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3] 07/14/1982
Rep. Sawyer, Harold S. [R-MI-5] 07/14/1982
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 07/14/1982
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-25] 07/14/1982
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-23] 07/14/1982
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 07/14/1982
Rep. Burgener, Clair W. [R-CA-43] 07/14/1982
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 07/14/1982
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 07/20/1982
Rep. Albosta, Donald J. [D-MI-10] 07/20/1982
Rep. Forsythe, Edwin B. [R-NJ-6] 07/20/1982
Rep. Williams, Lyle [R-OH-19] 07/20/1982
Rep. Blanchard, James [D-MI-18] 07/20/1982
Rep. Hightower, Jack E. [D-TX-13] 07/20/1982
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 07/20/1982
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-19] 07/20/1982
Rep. Collins, James M. [R-TX-3] 07/20/1982
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/20/1982
Rep. Evans, Billy Lee [D-GA-8] 07/20/1982
Rep. Rhodes, John J. [R-AZ-1] 07/20/1982
Rep. Brodhead, William [D-MI-17] 07/20/1982
Rep. Napier, John L. [R-SC-6] 07/20/1982
Rep. Foley, Thomas S. [D-WA-5] 07/20/1982
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 07/20/1982
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-12] 07/20/1982
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 07/20/1982
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 07/20/1982
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 07/20/1982
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/20/1982
Rep. Fuqua, Don [D-FL-2] 07/20/1982
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 07/20/1982
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/20/1982
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-34] 07/20/1982
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 07/20/1982
Rep. Whitley, Charles O., Sr. [D-NC-3] 07/20/1982
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 07/20/1982
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 07/22/1982
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 07/22/1982
Rep. White, Richard C. [D-TX-16] 07/22/1982
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2] 07/22/1982
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 07/22/1982
Rep. Zeferetti, Leo C. [D-NY-15] 07/22/1982
Rep. LeBoutillier, John [R-NY-6] 07/22/1982
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 07/22/1982
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/22/1982
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 07/22/1982
Rep. Siljander, Mark D. [R-MI-4] 07/22/1982
Rep. Stanton, J. William [R-OH-11] 07/22/1982
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 07/22/1982
Rep. Dunn, Jim [R-MI-6] 07/22/1982
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 07/22/1982
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 07/22/1982
Rep. DeNardis, Lawrence J. [R-CT-3] 07/22/1982
Rep. Pritchard, Joel [R-WA-1] 07/22/1982
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 07/22/1982
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 07/29/1982
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 07/29/1982
Rep. Fountain, L. H. [D-NC-2] 07/29/1982
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 07/29/1982
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 07/29/1982
Rep. Mottl, Ronald M. [D-OH-23] 07/29/1982
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 07/29/1982
Rep. Minish, Joseph G. [D-NJ-11] 07/29/1982
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 07/29/1982
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 07/29/1982
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 07/29/1982
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 07/29/1982
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 07/29/1982
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-22] 07/29/1982
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/29/1982
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 07/29/1982
Rep. Ratchford, William R. [D-CT-5] 08/03/1982
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 08/03/1982
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 08/03/1982
Rep. Andrews, Ike [D-NC-4] 08/03/1982
Rep. Clausen, Don H. [R-CA-2] 08/03/1982
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 08/03/1982
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 08/03/1982
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 08/03/1982
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-15] 08/03/1982
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 08/03/1982
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 08/03/1982
Rep. Fary, John G. [D-IL-5] 08/03/1982
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 08/05/1982
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-10] 08/05/1982
Rep. McCloskey, Paul N., Jr. [R-CA-12] 08/05/1982
Rep. Mica, Daniel Andrew [D-FL-11] 08/05/1982
Rep. Mitchell, Donald J. [R-NY-31] 08/05/1982
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 08/10/1982
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-37] 08/10/1982
Rep. Peyser, Peter A. [R-NY-23] 08/10/1982
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 08/10/1982
Rep. Jeffries, Jim [R-KS-2] 08/10/1982
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-42] 08/12/1982
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 08/12/1982
Rep. Zablocki, Clement J. [D-WI-4] 08/12/1982
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 08/12/1982
Rep. Ferraro, Geraldine A. [D-NY-9] 08/12/1982
Rep. Snyder, M. G. (Gene) [R-KY-4] 08/12/1982
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 08/12/1982
Rep. Beard, Robin [R-TN-6] 08/12/1982
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 08/18/1982
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 08/18/1982
Rep. Bowen, David R. [D-MS-2] 08/18/1982
Rep. Moffett, Toby [D-CT-6] 08/18/1982
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-24] 08/18/1982
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 08/18/1982
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20] 08/18/1982
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-12] 08/18/1982
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-10] 08/18/1982
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 08/18/1982
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-8] 08/18/1982
Rep. Evans, David W. [D-IN-6] 08/18/1982
Rep. Hillis, Elwood H. [R-IN-5] 08/18/1982
Rep. Shannon, James M. [D-MA-5] 08/18/1982
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 09/08/1982
Rep. Duncan, John J. [R-TN-2] 09/08/1982
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2] 09/08/1982
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/08/1982
Rep. Fithian, Floyd J. [D-IN-2] 09/08/1982
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 09/08/1982
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/08/1982
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5] 09/08/1982
Rep. Hollenbeck, Harold C. [R-NJ-9] 09/08/1982
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4] 09/08/1982
Rep. Winn, Larry, Jr. [R-KS-3] 09/08/1982
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 09/14/1982
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-22] 09/14/1982
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 09/14/1982
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 09/14/1982
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 09/14/1982
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 09/29/1982
Rep. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA-5] 09/29/1982
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 09/29/1982
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-11] 09/29/1982
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 09/29/1982
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 09/29/1982
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 09/29/1982
Rep. Brinkley, Jack [D-GA-3] 11/29/1982
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 11/29/1982
Rep. Brown, Clarence, Jr. [R-OH-7] 11/29/1982
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-10] 11/29/1982

Show cosponsors who withdrew