Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 06/02/1982
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7]* 06/02/1982
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 06/07/1982
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/07/1982
Rep. DeNardis, Lawrence J. [R-CT-3] 06/07/1982
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 06/28/1982
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/28/1982
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-32] 06/28/1982
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 06/28/1982
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/28/1982
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 06/28/1982
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 06/28/1982
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 06/28/1982
Rep. Ferraro, Geraldine A. [D-NY-9] 06/28/1982
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 06/28/1982
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-10] 06/28/1982
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 06/28/1982
Rep. Dougherty, Charles F. [R-PA-4] 06/28/1982
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-24] 06/28/1982
Rep. White, Richard C. [D-TX-16] 06/28/1982
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 06/28/1982
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/28/1982
Rep. Hillis, Elwood H. [R-IN-5] 07/14/1982
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/14/1982
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 07/14/1982
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 07/14/1982
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-12] 07/14/1982
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 07/14/1982
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 07/14/1982
Rep. Minish, Joseph G. [D-NJ-11] 07/20/1982
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 07/20/1982
Rep. Zeferetti, Leo C. [D-NY-15] 07/20/1982
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 07/20/1982
Rep. Bailey, Donald A. [D-PA-21] 07/20/1982
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 07/20/1982
Rep. Bingham, Jonathan B. [D-NY-22] 07/20/1982
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 07/20/1982
Rep. Hollenbeck, Harold C. [R-NJ-9] 07/20/1982
Rep. Whitley, Charles O., Sr. [D-NC-3] 07/20/1982
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-22] 08/13/1982
Rep. Nelligan, James L. [R-PA-11] 08/13/1982
Rep. LeBoutillier, John [R-NY-6] 08/13/1982
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8] 08/13/1982
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 08/13/1982
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 08/13/1982
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-26] 08/13/1982
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 08/13/1982
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 08/18/1982
Rep. Hance, Kent R. [D-TX-19] 09/08/1982
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/08/1982
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 09/08/1982
Rep. Lee, Gary A. [R-NY-33] 09/08/1982
Rep. Forsythe, Edwin B. [R-NJ-6] 09/08/1982
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 09/08/1982
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/08/1982
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 09/08/1982
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-7] 09/08/1982
Rep. Hansen, George V. [R-ID-2] 09/08/1982
Rep. Mattox, James A. [D-TX-5] 09/08/1982
Rep. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA-1] 09/08/1982
Rep. D'Amours, Norman E. [D-NH-1] 09/08/1982
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 09/08/1982
Rep. Bowen, David R. [D-MS-2] 09/08/1982
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 09/08/1982
Rep. Smith, Albert L., Jr. [R-AL-6] 09/08/1982
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 09/08/1982
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4] 09/08/1982
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 09/08/1982
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-14] 09/08/1982
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-24] 09/08/1982
Rep. Napier, John L. [R-SC-6] 09/08/1982
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 09/08/1982
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 09/08/1982
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 09/14/1982
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 09/14/1982
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 09/14/1982
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 09/14/1982
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 09/22/1982
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-20] 09/22/1982
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-13] 09/22/1982
Rep. Pritchard, Joel [R-WA-1] 09/22/1982
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 09/22/1982
Rep. Long, Clarence D. [D-MD-2] 09/22/1982
Rep. Fithian, Floyd J. [D-IN-2] 09/28/1982
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 11/29/1982
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 11/29/1982
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 12/06/1982