Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to modify the Insanity Defense in the Federal Courts.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/24/1982Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
09/09/1982Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Criminal Justice
08/17/1982Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Criminal Justice
08/12/1982Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Criminal Justice
07/22/1982Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Criminal Justice
07/21/1982Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Criminal Justice
06/30/1982Referred to Subcommittee on Criminal Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/24/1982Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/24/1982Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary06/24/1982 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Criminal Justice06/30/1982 Referred to
09/09/1982 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6716. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/24/1982)

Amends the Federal criminal code to authorize a verdict of "guilty but insane" for any criminal defendant who raises the issue of insanity by notice as provided by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure. Provides that a defendant is "guilty but insane" if his actions constitute all necessary elements of the offense charged other than the requisite state of mind.

Provides that if the dependant is found "guilty but insane" the court may commit the defendant to serve all or a portion of a sentence in a suitable facility for treatment of his mental condition. Requires the defendant to serve the remaining portion of his sentence upon release from the mental facility.