As of 07/27/2021 text has not been received for H.R.6788 - A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to clarify the period for which an employer is required to grant an employee who is a member of the National Guard or Reserve a leave of absence in order to allow the employee to perform required active duty for training.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to clarify the period for which an employer is required to grant an employee who is a member of the National Guard or Reserve a leave of absence in order to allow the employee to perform required active duty for training.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/14/1982Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
08/19/1982Reported to House by House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Report No: 97-782.
07/19/1982Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/15/1982SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.
09/14/1982HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
09/14/1982HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
08/19/1982HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 476.
08/19/1982HouseReported to House by House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Report No: 97-782.
07/22/1982HouseOrdered to be Reported.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/22/1982HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/19/1982HouseReferred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
07/19/1982HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs07/19/1982 Referred to
07/22/1982 Markup by
08/19/1982 Reported by H.Rept 97-782
Senate Veterans' Affairs09/15/1982 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6788. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/19/1982)

States that an employer of a member of a Reserve or National Guard component is not required to grant a leave of absence to such employee to perform active duty for training or inactive duty training in the armed forces for a total of more than 365 days within any 36 month period.