As of 07/25/2021 text has not been received for H.R.7044 - Mail Order Consumer Protection Amendments of 1982

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Mail Order Consumer Protection Amendments of 1982

Short Titles as Reported to House

Mail Order Consumer Protection Amendments of 1982

Short Titles as Introduced

Mail Order Consumer Protection Amendments of 1982

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title 39, United States Code, to strengthen the investigatory and enforcement powers of the Postal Service by authorizing certain inspection authority and by providing for civil penalties for violations of orders under section 3005 of such title (pertaining to schemes for obtaining money by false representations or lotteries), and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/13/1982Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Yea-Nay Vote: 320 - 61 (Record Vote No: 438).
10/04/1982Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service. Report No: 97-932.
08/19/1982Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date All Actions
12/13/1982Other Measure S.1407 (Amended) Passed House in Lieu.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/13/1982Laid on Table in House by Voice Vote.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/13/1982Passed House (Amended) by Yea-Nay Vote: 320 - 61 (Record Vote No: 438).
Action By: House of Representatives
12/13/1982Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/04/1982Placed on Union Calendar No: 582.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/04/1982Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service. Report No: 97-932.
09/28/1982Ordered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
09/28/1982Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
09/22/1982Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
09/15/1982Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Postal Personnel and Modernization
09/15/1982Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Postal Personnel and Modernization
09/07/1982Favorable Executive Comment Received From US Postal Service.
09/03/1982Favorable Executive Comment Received From Postal Rate Comm.
08/24/1982Executive Comment Requested from Postal Rate Comm, US Postal Service, OMB.
08/23/1982Referred to Subcommittee on Postal Personnel and Modernization.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
08/19/1982Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/19/1982Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 08/19/1982

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Post Office and Civil Service08/19/1982 Referred to
09/28/1982 Markup by
10/04/1982 Reported by H.Rept 97-932
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Postal Personnel and Modernization08/23/1982 Referred to
09/15/1982 Markup by
09/15/1982 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.7044. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (12/13/1982)

(Measure passed House, amended, roll call #438 (320-61))

Mail Order Consumer Protection Amendments of 1982 - Authorizes the United States Postal Service to issue an order requiring any person to cease and desist from conducting a lottery or scheme for obtaining money or property by false representations through the mail.

Authorizes the Postmaster General, in conducting an investigation to determine whether a person is engaged in such prohibited activity, to tender the price requested for an article or service offered through the mail. Declares that failure to provide an article or service after the price is tendered by the Postal Service may be considered in a hearing to determine if there is probable cause to believe that a prohibited activity has occurred. Sets forth provisions governing the conduct of a person tendering an offer on behalf of the Postal Service.

Declares that mailing an advertisement promoting the sale of a publication or a solicitation to purchase, or a purchase order for, such a publication is not prohibited if: (1) the advertisement is not false or misleading and contains no material misrepresentations of fact; (2) the advertisement discloses the source of any statements derived from or about the publication; and (3) neither the advertisement nor the publication is designed to promote the sale of another product as part of a commercial scheme.

Establishes a civil penalty to be assessed against any person who: (1) attempts to evade an order directing a postmaster to return mail addressed to such person or prohibiting a postmaster from paying a money order from, or to, such person; (2) fails to comply with a cease and desist order; or (3) assists any person to evade or not to comply with any such order. Authorizes the Postal Service to commence a civil action in the appropriate U.S. district court to enforce such a penalty.

Requires the Postmaster General to submit semiannual reports on the investigative activities of the Postal Service to the Board of Governors of the Postal Service. Directs the Board to transmit such reports, upon approval, to Congress.

Directs the Postmaster General to conduct and report to Congress on a program to educate consumers concerning schemes involving false representations through the mail.

Allows a Governor of the Board to serve beyond the expiration of his or her term until a successor takes office.