Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7]* 12/06/1982
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-34]* 12/06/1982
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1]* 12/06/1982
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-25]* 12/06/1982
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1]* 12/06/1982
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18]* 12/06/1982
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3]* 12/06/1982
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 12/06/1982
Rep. Harkin, Tom [D-IA-5]* 12/06/1982
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14]* 12/06/1982
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23]* 12/06/1982
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2]* 12/06/1982
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6]* 12/06/1982
Rep. Weber, Ed [R-OH-9]* 12/06/1982
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 12/06/1982
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-32]* 12/06/1982
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7]* 12/06/1982
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 12/06/1982
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16]* 12/06/1982
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-12]* 12/06/1982
Rep. Long, Clarence D. [D-MD-2]* 12/06/1982
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 12/06/1982
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13]* 12/06/1982
Rep. Heckler, Margaret M. [R-MA-10]* 12/06/1982
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-27]* 12/06/1982
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 12/06/1982
Rep. Winn, Larry, Jr. [R-KS-3]* 12/06/1982
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-22]* 12/06/1982
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-37] 12/08/1982
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/08/1982
Rep. Minish, Joseph G. [D-NJ-11] 12/08/1982
Rep. D'Amours, Norman E. [D-NH-1] 12/08/1982
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 12/08/1982
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 12/08/1982
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 12/08/1982
Rep. Mottl, Ronald M. [D-OH-23] 12/08/1982
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 12/08/1982
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 12/10/1982
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 12/10/1982
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20] 12/13/1982
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 12/13/1982
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-26] 12/14/1982
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-12] 12/14/1982
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 12/14/1982
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 12/16/1982
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 12/16/1982
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 12/17/1982