Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-19]* 04/09/1981
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-13] 05/07/1981
Rep. Evans, Thomas B., Jr. [R-DE-At Large] 05/07/1981
Rep. LeBoutillier, John [R-NY-6] 05/07/1981
Rep. Findley, Paul [R-IL-20] 06/08/1981
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 07/09/1981
Rep. Benjamin, Adam, Jr. [D-IN-1] 07/09/1981
Rep. Burgener, Clair W. [R-CA-43] 07/09/1981
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 07/09/1981
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 07/09/1981
Rep. Dougherty, Charles F. [R-PA-4] 07/09/1981
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 07/09/1981
Rep. Emery, David F. [R-ME-1] 07/09/1981
Rep. Erdahl, Arlen [R-MN-1] 07/09/1981
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 07/09/1981
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 07/09/1981
Rep. Forsythe, Edwin B. [R-NJ-6] 07/09/1981
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 07/09/1981
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 07/09/1981
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 07/09/1981
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-34] 07/09/1981
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 07/09/1981
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 07/09/1981
Rep. Robinson, J. Kenneth [R-VA-7] 07/09/1981
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 07/09/1981
Rep. Shamansky, Bob [D-OH-12] 07/09/1981
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 07/09/1981
Rep. Zablocki, Clement J. [D-WI-4] 07/09/1981
Rep. Fenwick, Millicent H. [R-NJ-5] 07/23/1981
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/23/1981
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 07/23/1981
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 07/23/1981
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/23/1981
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 07/23/1981
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/23/1981
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-24] 07/23/1981
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-29] 07/23/1981
Rep. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA-1] 07/23/1981
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 07/23/1981
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-25] 07/31/1981
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 09/15/1981
Rep. Siljander, Mark D. [R-MI-4] 09/15/1981
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-20] 09/15/1981