Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-26]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-12]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Smith, Joseph F. [D-PA-3]* 11/20/1981
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Atkinson, Eugene V. [D-PA-25]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Fiedler, Bobbi [R-CA-21]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Fithian, Floyd J. [D-IN-2]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Blanchard, James [D-MI-18]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-13]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Beard, Robin [R-TN-6]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Corcoran, Tom [R-IL-15]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-25]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-38]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-19]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-27]* 11/20/1981
Rep. LeBoutillier, John [R-NY-6]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Rosenthal, Benjamin S. [D-NY-8]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-13]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Weber, Ed [R-OH-9]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-14]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-6]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Forsythe, Edwin B. [R-NJ-6]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-42]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Brodhead, William [D-MI-17]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-7]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-15]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Hollenbeck, Harold C. [R-NJ-9]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Pritchard, Joel [R-WA-1]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Smith, Albert L., Jr. [R-AL-6]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Siljander, Mark D. [R-MI-4]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Gradison, Willis D., Jr. [D-OH-1]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Dougherty, Charles F. [R-PA-4]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Minish, Joseph G. [D-NJ-11]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Bingham, Jonathan B. [D-NY-22]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Fenwick, Millicent H. [R-NJ-5]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-11]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Kogovsek, Ray [D-CO-3]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3]* 11/20/1981
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 12/08/1981
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 12/08/1981
Rep. Erdahl, Arlen [R-MN-1] 12/08/1981
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 12/08/1981
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-24] 12/08/1981
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 12/08/1981
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-16] 12/08/1981
Rep. Richmond, Frederick W. [D-NY-14] 12/08/1981
Rep. Stratton, Samuel S. [D-NY-28] 12/08/1981
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 12/08/1981
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-27] 12/08/1981
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 12/08/1981
Rep. Bowen, David R. [D-MS-2] 12/08/1981
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-1] 12/08/1981
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 12/08/1981
Rep. Goldwater, Barry, Jr. [R-CA-20] 12/08/1981
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-18] 12/08/1981
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 12/08/1981
Rep. Schulze, Richard T. [R-PA-5] 12/08/1981
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 12/08/1981
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-36] 12/08/1981
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 12/08/1981
Rep. Peyser, Peter A. [R-NY-23] 12/08/1981
Rep. Winn, Larry, Jr. [R-KS-3] 12/08/1981
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 12/08/1981
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 12/08/1981
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-34] 12/08/1981
Rep. Kramer, Ken [R-CO-5] 12/08/1981
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-32] 12/08/1981
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 12/08/1981
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 12/08/1981
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 12/08/1981
Rep. Ertel, Allen E. [D-PA-17] 12/08/1981
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 12/08/1981
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/08/1981
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 12/08/1981
Rep. Harkin, Tom [D-IA-5] 12/08/1981
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 12/08/1981
Rep. Bailey, Donald A. [D-PA-21] 12/08/1981
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 12/08/1981
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 12/08/1981
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 12/08/1981
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 01/26/1982
Rep. Railsback, Thomas F. [R-IL-19] 01/26/1982
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-24] 01/26/1982
Rep. Deckard, Joel [R-IN-8] 01/26/1982
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-11] 01/26/1982
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 01/26/1982
Rep. Long, Clarence D. [D-MD-2] 01/26/1982
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 01/26/1982
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 01/26/1982
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/26/1982
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 01/26/1982
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 01/26/1982
Rep. Carman, Gregory W. [R-NY-3] 01/26/1982
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-17] 01/26/1982
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-34] 01/26/1982
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 01/26/1982
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 01/26/1982
Rep. Coyne, James K. [R-PA-8] 01/26/1982
Rep. Marks, Marc L. [R-PA-24] 01/26/1982
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 01/26/1982
Rep. Corrada, Baltasar [I-PR-At Large] 01/26/1982
Rep. Marriott, David Daniel [R-UT-2] 01/26/1982
Rep. DeNardis, Lawrence J. [R-CT-3] 01/26/1982
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-35] 01/26/1982
Rep. Rudd, Eldon D. [R-AZ-4] 01/26/1982
Rep. Grisham, Wayne R. [R-CA-33] 01/26/1982
Rep. Patterson, Jerry M. [D-CA-38] 01/26/1982
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 01/26/1982
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 01/26/1982
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-12] 01/26/1982
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 01/26/1982
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 01/26/1982
Rep. Shannon, James M. [D-MA-5] 02/02/1982
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/03/1982
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-7] 02/03/1982
Rep. Collins, James M. [R-TX-3] 02/03/1982
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 02/03/1982
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 02/09/1982
Rep. McDonald, Lawrence P. [D-GA-7] 02/09/1982
Rep. Moffett, Toby [D-CT-6] 02/09/1982
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 02/09/1982
Rep. Won Pat, Antonio B. [D-GU-At Large] 02/09/1982
Rep. Andrews, Ike [D-NC-4] 02/09/1982
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 02/09/1982
Rep. Staton, David Michael [R-WV-3] 02/09/1982
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 02/09/1982
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 02/09/1982
Rep. Ferraro, Geraldine A. [D-NY-9] 02/09/1982
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 02/09/1982
Rep. Ashbrook, John M. [R-OH-17] 02/09/1982
Rep. Benjamin, Adam, Jr. [D-IN-1] 02/09/1982
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-15] 03/16/1982
Rep. Zeferetti, Leo C. [D-NY-15] 03/16/1982
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/16/1982
Rep. Nelligan, James L. [R-PA-11] 03/16/1982
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/16/1982