Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/24/1982
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/24/1982
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-26]* 02/24/1982
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 02/24/1982
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5]* 02/24/1982
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/24/1982
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2]* 02/24/1982
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 02/24/1982
Rep. Fithian, Floyd J. [D-IN-2]* 02/24/1982
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-21]* 02/24/1982
Rep. Grisham, Wayne R. [R-CA-33]* 02/24/1982
Rep. Kogovsek, Ray [D-CO-3]* 02/24/1982
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6]* 02/24/1982
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/24/1982
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-38]* 02/24/1982
Rep. Richmond, Frederick W. [D-NY-14]* 02/24/1982
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18]* 02/24/1982
Rep. Williams, Lyle [R-OH-19]* 02/24/1982
Rep. Benedict, Cleve [R-WV-2]* 02/24/1982
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15]* 02/24/1982
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-35]* 02/24/1982
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 02/24/1982
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 02/24/1982
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 02/24/1982
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3]* 02/24/1982
Rep. Dougherty, Charles F. [R-PA-4]* 02/24/1982
Rep. Evans, Billy Lee [D-GA-8]* 02/24/1982
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6]* 02/24/1982
Rep. Bailey, Donald A. [D-PA-21] 03/03/1982
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/03/1982
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-36] 03/03/1982
Rep. Heckler, Margaret M. [R-MA-10] 03/08/1982
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 03/08/1982
Rep. Derwinski, Edward J. [R-IL-4] 03/08/1982
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 03/08/1982
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-34] 03/08/1982
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 03/08/1982
Rep. Corcoran, Tom [R-IL-15] 03/08/1982
Rep. Emery, David F. [R-ME-1] 03/08/1982
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/08/1982
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-42] 03/08/1982
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 03/08/1982
Rep. Latta, Delbert L. [R-OH-5] 03/08/1982
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-7] 03/08/1982
Rep. Martin, James G. [R-NC-9] 03/08/1982
Rep. Santini, James D. [D-NV-98] 03/08/1982
Rep. Weber, Ed [R-OH-9] 03/08/1982
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-34] 03/08/1982
Rep. Bowen, David R. [D-MS-2] 03/08/1982
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/08/1982
Rep. Robinson, J. Kenneth [R-VA-7] 03/08/1982
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 03/08/1982
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/08/1982
Rep. McDonald, Lawrence P. [D-GA-7] 03/08/1982
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 03/08/1982
Rep. Crane, Daniel B. [R-IL-22] 03/08/1982
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-14] 03/08/1982
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 03/08/1982
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 03/08/1982
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 03/08/1982
Rep. Lee, Gary A. [R-NY-33] 03/08/1982
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 03/08/1982
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 03/08/1982
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 03/08/1982
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 03/15/1982
Rep. Corrada, Baltasar [I-PR-At Large] 03/15/1982
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 03/15/1982
Rep. LeBoutillier, John [R-NY-6] 03/15/1982
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 03/15/1982
Rep. Goldwater, Barry, Jr. [R-CA-20] 03/15/1982
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-18] 03/29/1982
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-19] 03/29/1982
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/29/1982
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-25] 03/29/1982
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 03/29/1982
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-15] 03/29/1982
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 03/29/1982
Rep. Railsback, Thomas F. [R-IL-19] 03/29/1982
Rep. DeNardis, Lawrence J. [R-CT-3] 03/29/1982
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 03/31/1982
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 03/31/1982
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 03/31/1982
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 03/31/1982
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-6] 03/31/1982
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 03/31/1982
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 05/12/1982
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 05/12/1982
Rep. Marriott, David Daniel [R-UT-2] 05/12/1982
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 05/12/1982
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/12/1982
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-24] 05/12/1982
Rep. Smith, Joseph F. [D-PA-3] 05/12/1982
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 05/12/1982
Rep. Shamansky, Bob [D-OH-12] 05/20/1982
Rep. Carney, William [R-NY-1] 05/20/1982
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-13] 05/20/1982
Rep. Ertel, Allen E. [D-PA-17] 05/20/1982
Rep. Coyne, James K. [R-PA-8] 05/20/1982
Rep. Hagedorn, Thomas M. [R-MN-2] 06/07/1982
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-11] 06/07/1982
Rep. Siljander, Mark D. [R-MI-4] 07/12/1982
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 07/12/1982
Rep. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA-1] 07/12/1982
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 07/12/1982
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 07/14/1982
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 08/19/1982
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 09/08/1982
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/08/1982
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 09/08/1982
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 09/16/1982
Rep. Smith, Albert L., Jr. [R-AL-6] 09/22/1982
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 09/29/1982
Rep. Evans, Thomas B., Jr. [R-DE-At Large] 11/29/1982
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 12/13/1982