Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/05/1982
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 06/10/1982
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-26] 06/10/1982
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/10/1982
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/10/1982
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 06/10/1982
Rep. Weber, Ed [R-OH-9] 06/10/1982
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 06/10/1982
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-16] 06/10/1982
Rep. Blanchard, James [D-MI-18] 06/10/1982
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 06/10/1982
Rep. Rosenthal, Benjamin S. [D-NY-8] 06/10/1982
Rep. Fiedler, Bobbi [R-CA-21] 06/10/1982
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 06/10/1982
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-35] 06/10/1982
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/10/1982
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/10/1982
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-11] 06/10/1982
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 06/10/1982
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/10/1982
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 06/10/1982
Rep. Bowen, David R. [D-MS-2] 06/10/1982
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-27] 06/10/1982
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-7] 06/10/1982
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 06/10/1982
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 06/10/1982
Rep. Albosta, Donald J. [D-MI-10] 06/10/1982
Rep. Shamansky, Bob [D-OH-12] 06/10/1982
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 06/10/1982
Rep. Hollenbeck, Harold C. [R-NJ-9] 06/10/1982
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 06/10/1982
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/10/1982
Rep. Corcoran, Tom [R-IL-15] 06/10/1982
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-8] 06/10/1982
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 06/10/1982
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 06/10/1982
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-38] 06/10/1982
Rep. Jeffries, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/10/1982
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/10/1982
Rep. Brodhead, William [D-MI-17] 06/10/1982
Rep. Long, Clarence D. [D-MD-2] 06/10/1982
Rep. Pritchard, Joel [R-WA-1] 06/10/1982
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 06/10/1982
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 06/10/1982
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-20] 06/10/1982
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 06/10/1982
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 06/10/1982
Rep. Fenwick, Millicent H. [R-NJ-5] 06/10/1982
Rep. Richmond, Frederick W. [D-NY-14] 06/10/1982
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-15] 06/10/1982
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-25] 06/10/1982
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-14] 06/10/1982
Rep. Peyser, Peter A. [R-NY-23] 06/10/1982
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-18] 06/10/1982
Rep. Mottl, Ronald M. [D-OH-23] 06/10/1982
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 06/10/1982
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/10/1982
Rep. LeBoutillier, John [R-NY-6] 06/10/1982
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 06/10/1982
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-32] 06/10/1982
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 06/10/1982
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 06/10/1982
Rep. Fithian, Floyd J. [D-IN-2] 06/10/1982
Rep. Dougherty, Charles F. [R-PA-4] 06/10/1982
Rep. Levitas, Elliott H. [D-GA-4] 06/10/1982
Rep. Heckler, Margaret M. [R-MA-10] 06/10/1982
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 06/10/1982
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-10] 06/10/1982
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 06/10/1982
Rep. Minish, Joseph G. [D-NJ-11] 06/10/1982
Rep. Bailey, Donald A. [D-PA-21] 06/10/1982
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/10/1982
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 06/10/1982
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 06/10/1982
Rep. Atkinson, Eugene V. [D-PA-25] 06/10/1982
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 06/10/1982
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-11] 06/10/1982
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 06/10/1982
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/10/1982
Rep. Patterson, Jerry M. [D-CA-38] 06/10/1982
Rep. Roemer, Buddy [D-LA-4] 06/10/1982
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 06/10/1982
Rep. Ratchford, William R. [D-CT-5] 06/10/1982
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 06/10/1982
Rep. Derwinski, Edward J. [R-IL-4] 06/10/1982
Rep. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN-4] 07/22/1982
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 07/22/1982
Rep. Moffett, Toby [D-CT-6] 07/22/1982
Rep. Ferraro, Geraldine A. [D-NY-9] 07/22/1982
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 07/22/1982
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/22/1982
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 07/22/1982
Rep. Jones, James R. [D-OK-1] 07/22/1982
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-15] 07/22/1982
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/22/1982
Rep. Marriott, David Daniel [R-UT-2] 08/11/1982
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-19] 08/11/1982
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 08/11/1982
Rep. Forsythe, Edwin B. [R-NJ-6] 08/11/1982
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-17] 08/11/1982
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 08/11/1982
Rep. Kramer, Ken [R-CO-5] 08/11/1982
Rep. McDonald, Lawrence P. [D-GA-7] 08/11/1982
Rep. Coyne, James K. [R-PA-8] 08/11/1982
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 08/11/1982
Rep. Clausen, Don H. [R-CA-2] 08/11/1982
Rep. Benjamin, Adam, Jr. [D-IN-1] 08/11/1982
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 08/11/1982
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 08/11/1982
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 08/11/1982
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-13] 08/11/1982
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-24] 08/11/1982
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-13] 08/11/1982
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 08/11/1982
Rep. Gradison, Willis D., Jr. [D-OH-1] 08/11/1982
Rep. Bingham, Jonathan B. [D-NY-22] 08/11/1982
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 08/11/1982
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 08/11/1982
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 08/11/1982
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 08/11/1982
Rep. Harkin, Tom [D-IA-5] 08/11/1982
Rep. Carney, William [R-NY-1] 08/11/1982
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 08/11/1982
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 09/14/1982
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/14/1982
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 09/14/1982
Rep. DeNardis, Lawrence J. [R-CT-3] 09/14/1982
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 09/14/1982
Rep. Smith, Joseph F. [D-PA-3] 09/14/1982
Rep. Smith, Albert L., Jr. [R-AL-6] 09/14/1982
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-7] 09/14/1982
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 09/14/1982
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-27] 09/14/1982
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/14/1982
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 09/14/1982
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 09/14/1982
Rep. Kogovsek, Ray [D-CO-3] 09/14/1982
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 09/14/1982
Rep. Mitchell, Donald J. [R-NY-31] 09/14/1982