Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emery, David F. [R-ME-1]* 05/06/1982
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 05/06/1982
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 05/25/1982
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 05/25/1982
Rep. Hartnett, Thomas F. [R-SC-1] 05/25/1982
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-1] 05/25/1982
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 05/25/1982
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-39] 05/25/1982
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 05/25/1982
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 05/25/1982
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 05/25/1982
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 05/25/1982
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/25/1982
Rep. Bailey, Wendell [R-MO-8] 05/25/1982
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 05/25/1982
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 05/25/1982
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-24] 05/25/1982
Rep. Nelligan, James L. [R-PA-11] 05/25/1982
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 05/25/1982
Rep. Fiedler, Bobbi [R-CA-21] 05/25/1982
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 05/25/1982
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 05/25/1982
Rep. Jeffries, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/25/1982
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 05/25/1982
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/25/1982
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 05/25/1982
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-36] 06/14/1982
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 06/14/1982
Rep. Hopkins, Larry J. [R-KY-6] 08/02/1982
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 08/02/1982
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 08/02/1982
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 08/18/1982
Rep. Williams, Lyle [R-OH-19] 08/18/1982