Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 05/10/1982
Rep. Brodhead, William [D-MI-17]* 05/10/1982
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-26]* 05/10/1982
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8]* 05/10/1982
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/10/1982
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 06/21/1982
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 06/21/1982
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 06/21/1982
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-21] 06/21/1982
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-18] 06/21/1982
Rep. Forsythe, Edwin B. [R-NJ-6] 06/21/1982
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-24] 06/21/1982
Rep. Blanchard, James [D-MI-18] 06/21/1982
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/21/1982
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-11] 06/21/1982
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 06/21/1982
Rep. Hollenbeck, Harold C. [R-NJ-9] 06/21/1982
Rep. Ferraro, Geraldine A. [D-NY-9] 06/21/1982
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-15] 06/21/1982
Rep. Heckler, Margaret M. [R-MA-10] 06/21/1982
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 06/21/1982
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 06/21/1982
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-13] 06/21/1982
Rep. Won Pat, Antonio B. [D-GU-At Large] 06/21/1982
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-37] 06/21/1982
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 06/21/1982
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 06/21/1982
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 06/21/1982
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/21/1982
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 06/21/1982
Rep. Mitchell, Donald J. [R-NY-31] 06/21/1982
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 06/21/1982
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 06/21/1982
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/21/1982
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 06/21/1982
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 06/21/1982
Rep. Dougherty, Charles F. [R-PA-4] 06/21/1982
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/21/1982
Rep. Smith, Albert L., Jr. [R-AL-6] 06/21/1982
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 06/21/1982
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 06/21/1982
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/21/1982
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 06/21/1982
Rep. Peyser, Peter A. [R-NY-23] 06/21/1982
Rep. Rosenthal, Benjamin S. [D-NY-8] 06/21/1982
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-8] 06/21/1982
Rep. LeBoutillier, John [R-NY-6] 06/21/1982
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-32] 06/21/1982
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 06/21/1982
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 06/21/1982
Rep. Fenwick, Millicent H. [R-NJ-5] 06/21/1982
Rep. Long, Clarence D. [D-MD-2] 06/21/1982
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 06/21/1982
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 06/21/1982
Rep. Fithian, Floyd J. [D-IN-2] 06/21/1982
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-16] 06/21/1982
Rep. Corcoran, Tom [R-IL-15] 06/21/1982
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-20] 06/21/1982
Rep. Roemer, Buddy [D-LA-4] 06/21/1982
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 06/21/1982
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 06/21/1982
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 06/21/1982
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 06/21/1982
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-29] 06/21/1982
Rep. Minish, Joseph G. [D-NJ-11] 06/21/1982
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 06/21/1982
Rep. Smith, Joseph F. [D-PA-3] 06/21/1982
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-15] 06/21/1982
Rep. Marriott, David Daniel [R-UT-2] 06/21/1982
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-27] 07/28/1982
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-24] 07/28/1982
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/28/1982
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-25] 07/28/1982
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/28/1982
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 07/28/1982
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 07/28/1982
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 07/28/1982
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 07/28/1982
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-35] 07/28/1982
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/28/1982
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 07/28/1982
Rep. Bailey, Donald A. [D-PA-21] 07/28/1982
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/28/1982
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-19] 07/28/1982
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-7] 07/28/1982
Rep. Ratchford, William R. [D-CT-5] 07/28/1982
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 07/28/1982
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 07/28/1982
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/28/1982
Rep. Shamansky, Bob [D-OH-12] 07/28/1982
Rep. Burton, Phillip [D-CA-6] 09/13/1982
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 09/13/1982
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/13/1982
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 09/13/1982
Rep. DeNardis, Lawrence J. [R-CT-3] 09/13/1982
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 09/13/1982
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 09/13/1982
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 09/13/1982
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-7] 09/13/1982
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 09/13/1982
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 09/13/1982
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 09/13/1982
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-14] 09/13/1982
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 09/13/1982
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-13] 09/13/1982
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-38] 09/13/1982
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 09/13/1982
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/13/1982
Rep. Gradison, Willis D., Jr. [D-OH-1] 09/13/1982
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-17] 09/13/1982
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-27] 09/13/1982
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 09/13/1982
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 09/15/1982
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/15/1982
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 09/15/1982
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/23/1982
Rep. Fiedler, Bobbi [R-CA-21] 09/23/1982
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 09/23/1982
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-6] 09/30/1982
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 09/30/1982