Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1]* 05/12/1982
Rep. Andrews, Ike [D-NC-4]* 05/12/1982
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 05/12/1982
Rep. Martin, James G. [R-NC-9]* 05/12/1982
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 05/12/1982
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5]* 05/12/1982
Rep. Whitley, Charles O., Sr. [D-NC-3]* 05/12/1982
Rep. Hendon, Bill [R-NC-11]* 05/12/1982
Rep. Johnston, Eugene (Gene) [R-NC-6]* 05/12/1982
Rep. Smith, Albert L., Jr. [R-AL-6] 05/19/1982
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 05/21/1982
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-12] 05/27/1982
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 06/02/1982
Rep. Beard, Robin [R-TN-6] 06/02/1982
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 06/08/1982
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 06/08/1982
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/08/1982
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 06/08/1982
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/08/1982
Rep. Smith, Joseph F. [D-PA-3] 06/08/1982
Rep. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL-7] 06/08/1982
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 06/08/1982
Rep. Forsythe, Edwin B. [R-NJ-6] 06/08/1982
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 06/08/1982
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-1] 06/08/1982
Rep. Albosta, Donald J. [D-MI-10] 06/08/1982
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 06/08/1982
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 06/08/1982
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 06/08/1982
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 06/08/1982
Rep. Weber, Ed [R-OH-9] 06/08/1982
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 06/08/1982
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-29] 06/08/1982
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 06/08/1982
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-24] 06/08/1982
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 06/08/1982
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 06/08/1982
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/08/1982
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [D-FL-8] 06/08/1982
Rep. Rudd, Eldon D. [R-AZ-4] 06/15/1982
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 06/15/1982
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-8] 06/15/1982
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 06/15/1982
Rep. Duncan, John J. [R-TN-2] 06/15/1982
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 06/15/1982
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 06/15/1982
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 06/15/1982
Rep. Carman, Gregory W. [R-NY-3] 06/15/1982
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/15/1982
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/15/1982
Rep. Roemer, Buddy [D-LA-4] 06/15/1982
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-25] 07/13/1982
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 07/13/1982
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 07/13/1982
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-7] 07/21/1982