Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1]* 07/21/1982
Rep. Derwinski, Edward J. [R-IL-4]* 07/21/1982
Rep. Emery, David F. [R-ME-1]* 07/21/1982
Rep. Fithian, Floyd J. [D-IN-2]* 07/21/1982
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1]* 07/21/1982
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-8]* 07/21/1982
Rep. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA-5]* 07/21/1982
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-34]* 07/21/1982
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 07/21/1982
Rep. LeBoutillier, John [R-NY-6]* 07/21/1982
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 07/21/1982
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41]* 07/21/1982
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/21/1982
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-14]* 07/21/1982
Rep. Rosenthal, Benjamin S. [D-NY-8]* 07/21/1982
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 07/21/1982
Rep. Weber, Ed [R-OH-9]* 07/21/1982
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-20]* 07/21/1982
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 07/21/1982
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 07/21/1982
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 07/21/1982
Rep. Ertel, Allen E. [D-PA-17] 07/22/1982
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 07/22/1982
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-11] 07/22/1982
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/22/1982
Rep. Corcoran, Tom [R-IL-15] 07/22/1982
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 07/22/1982
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/22/1982
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 07/22/1982
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 07/22/1982
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/22/1982
Rep. Corrada, Baltasar [I-PR-At Large] 07/22/1982
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 07/22/1982
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 07/27/1982
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 07/27/1982
Rep. Moffett, Toby [D-CT-6] 07/27/1982
Rep. Heckler, Margaret M. [R-MA-10] 07/27/1982
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 07/27/1982
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 08/03/1982
Rep. Campbell, Carroll A., Jr. [R-SC-4] 08/03/1982
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-24] 08/03/1982
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 08/03/1982
Rep. Ferraro, Geraldine A. [D-NY-9] 08/03/1982
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 08/03/1982
Rep. Daniel, Robert W., Jr. [R-VA-4] 08/03/1982
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 08/03/1982
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-15] 08/03/1982
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 08/03/1982
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 08/19/1982
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 08/19/1982
Rep. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN-4] 08/19/1982
Rep. Ratchford, William R. [D-CT-5] 08/19/1982
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/19/1982
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 08/19/1982
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 11/29/1982