Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-11]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Conable, Barber B., Jr. [R-NY-35]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Levitas, Elliott H. [D-GA-4]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Martin, James G. [R-NC-9]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Moore, W. Henson [R-LA-6]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Grisham, Wayne R. [R-CA-33]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2]* 06/07/1982
Rep. DeNardis, Lawrence J. [R-CT-3]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Burgener, Clair W. [R-CA-43]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Carney, William [R-NY-1]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-29]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-30]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Goldwater, Barry, Jr. [R-CA-20]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-42]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Weber, Ed [R-OH-9]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Forsythe, Edwin B. [R-NJ-6]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Bafalis, L. A. (Skip) [R-FL-10]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-32]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Hopkins, Larry J. [R-KY-6]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Campbell, Carroll A., Jr. [R-SC-4]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Coyne, James K. [R-PA-8]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Hillis, Elwood H. [R-IN-5]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Broyhill, James T. [R-NC-10]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Beard, Robin [R-TN-6]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Marriott, David Daniel [R-UT-2]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-25]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Sawyer, Harold S. [R-MI-5]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-24]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Mollohan, Robert H. [D-WV-1]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-2]* 06/07/1982
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-38] 06/28/1982
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-9] 06/28/1982
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/28/1982
Rep. Staton, David Michael [R-WV-3] 06/28/1982
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 06/28/1982
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/28/1982
Rep. Cheney, Dick [R-WY-At Large] 06/28/1982
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 06/28/1982
Rep. Clausen, Don H. [R-CA-2] 06/28/1982
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 06/28/1982
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 06/28/1982
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 06/28/1982
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-34] 06/28/1982
Rep. Hagedorn, Thomas M. [R-MN-2] 06/28/1982
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2] 06/28/1982
Rep. Mitchell, Donald J. [R-NY-31] 06/28/1982
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 06/28/1982
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 06/28/1982
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/28/1982
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2] 06/28/1982
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-12] 06/28/1982
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-6] 06/28/1982
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4] 08/03/1982
Rep. Hartnett, Thomas F. [R-SC-1] 08/03/1982
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 08/03/1982
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 08/03/1982
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 08/03/1982
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [D-FL-8] 08/03/1982
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 08/03/1982
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 08/03/1982
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 08/03/1982
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 08/03/1982
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 08/03/1982
Rep. Collins, James M. [R-TX-3] 09/16/1982
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 09/29/1982