Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bafalis, L. A. (Skip) [R-FL-10]* 01/05/1981
Rep. Grisham, Wayne R. [R-CA-33] 01/22/1981
Rep. Collins, James M. [R-TX-3] 01/22/1981
Rep. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL-7] 01/22/1981
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 01/22/1981
Rep. Winn, Larry, Jr. [R-KS-3] 01/22/1981
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 01/22/1981
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 01/22/1981
Rep. Beard, Robin [R-TN-6] 01/22/1981
Rep. Guyer, Tennyson [R-OH-4] 01/22/1981
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5] 01/22/1981
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 01/22/1981
Rep. Derwinski, Edward J. [R-IL-4] 01/22/1981
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-34] 01/22/1981
Rep. Kramer, Ken [R-CO-5] 01/22/1981
Rep. Snyder, M. G. (Gene) [R-KY-4] 01/22/1981
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 01/22/1981
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 01/22/1981
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 01/22/1981
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-27] 01/22/1981
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 01/22/1981
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2] 01/22/1981
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 01/22/1981
Rep. Hartnett, Thomas F. [R-SC-1] 01/22/1981
Rep. Hall, Sam B., Jr. [D-TX-1] 01/22/1981
Rep. Stump, Bob [D-AZ-3] 01/22/1981
Rep. Daniel, Robert W., Jr. [R-VA-4] 01/22/1981
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 01/22/1981
Rep. Hansen, George V. [R-ID-2] 01/22/1981
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 01/28/1981
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [D-FL-8] 01/28/1981
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 01/28/1981
Rep. Evans, Billy Lee [D-GA-8] 01/28/1981
Rep. Johnston, Eugene (Gene) [R-NC-6] 01/28/1981
Rep. Bailey, Wendell [R-MO-8] 01/28/1981
Rep. Rudd, Eldon D. [R-AZ-4] 01/28/1981
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 01/28/1981
Rep. Smith, Albert L., Jr. [R-AL-6] 01/28/1981
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3] 01/28/1981
Rep. Goldwater, Barry, Jr. [R-CA-20] 01/28/1981
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-2] 01/28/1981
Rep. Ashbrook, John M. [R-OH-17] 01/28/1981
Rep. Evans, David W. [D-IN-6] 02/25/1981
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 02/25/1981
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 02/25/1981
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 02/25/1981
Rep. Carney, William [R-NY-1] 02/25/1981
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 02/25/1981
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 02/25/1981
Rep. Hance, Kent R. [D-TX-19] 02/25/1981
Rep. Taylor, G. [R-MO-7] 02/25/1981
Rep. Rousselot, John H. [R-CA-26] 02/25/1981
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3] 02/25/1981
Rep. Robinson, J. Kenneth [R-VA-7] 02/25/1981
Rep. Jeffries, Jim [R-KS-2] 02/25/1981
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 02/25/1981
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 02/25/1981
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4] 02/25/1981
Rep. Roemer, Buddy [D-LA-4] 02/25/1981
Rep. Dougherty, Charles F. [R-PA-4] 02/25/1981
Rep. Fiedler, Bobbi [R-CA-21] 02/25/1981
Rep. Zeferetti, Leo C. [D-NY-15] 03/11/1981
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 03/11/1981
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 03/11/1981
Rep. Mollohan, Robert H. [D-WV-1] 05/20/1981
Rep. Bowen, David R. [D-MS-2] 05/20/1981
Rep. Hagedorn, Thomas M. [R-MN-2] 05/20/1981
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 05/20/1981
Rep. Fary, John G. [D-IL-5] 05/20/1981
Rep. Dunn, Jim [R-MI-6] 01/26/1982
Rep. Loeffler, Tom [R-TX-21] 01/26/1982