Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rhodes, John J. [R-AZ-1]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Roberts, Clint [R-SD-2]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Jeffries, Jim [R-KS-2]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Bafalis, L. A. (Skip) [R-FL-10]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Andrews, Ike [D-NC-4]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-34]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Bingham, Jonathan B. [D-NY-22]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-15]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Fountain, L. H. [D-NC-2]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Beard, Robin [R-TN-6]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Weber, Ed [R-OH-9]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Napier, John L. [R-SC-6]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Corrada, Baltasar [I-PR-At Large]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Perkins, Carl Dewey [D-KY-7]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Fenwick, Millicent H. [R-NJ-5]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Derwinski, Edward J. [R-IL-4]* 08/19/1982
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL-7]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-8]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-34]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Hagedorn, Thomas M. [R-MN-2]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 08/19/1982
Rep. DeNardis, Lawrence J. [R-CT-3]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-14]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Wampler, William C. [R-VA-9]* 08/19/1982
Rep. O'Brien, George M. [R-IL-17]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Patman, William N. [D-TX-14]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Ginn, Bo [D-GA-1]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-38]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-7]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Fuqua, Don [D-FL-2]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Stanton, J. William [R-OH-11]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Foley, Thomas S. [D-WA-5]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Hansen, George V. [R-ID-2]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Fary, John G. [D-IL-5]* 08/19/1982
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 09/08/1982
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 09/08/1982
Rep. McClory, Robert [R-IL-13] 09/08/1982
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 09/08/1982
Rep. Winn, Larry, Jr. [R-KS-3] 09/08/1982
Rep. LeBoutillier, John [R-NY-6] 09/08/1982
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5] 09/08/1982
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3] 09/08/1982
Rep. Bailey, Donald A. [D-PA-21] 09/08/1982
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-6] 09/08/1982
Rep. Williams, Lyle [R-OH-19] 09/08/1982
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 09/08/1982
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 09/08/1982
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-37] 09/08/1982
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 09/08/1982
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-25] 09/08/1982
Rep. Zablocki, Clement J. [D-WI-4] 09/08/1982
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 09/15/1982
Rep. Daniel, Robert W., Jr. [R-VA-4] 09/15/1982
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-32] 09/15/1982
Rep. Grisham, Wayne R. [R-CA-33] 09/15/1982
Rep. Clausen, Don H. [R-CA-2] 09/15/1982
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 09/15/1982
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 09/15/1982
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 09/22/1982
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-13] 09/22/1982
Rep. Goldwater, Barry, Jr. [R-CA-20] 09/22/1982
Rep. Forsythe, Edwin B. [R-NJ-6] 09/22/1982
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 09/29/1982
Rep. Stump, Bob [D-AZ-3] 10/01/1982
Rep. Hall, Sam B., Jr. [D-TX-1] 12/14/1982
Rep. Carney, William [R-NY-1] 12/14/1982
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 12/14/1982
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 12/14/1982
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 12/14/1982
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 12/14/1982
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 12/14/1982
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 12/14/1982
Rep. Kogovsek, Ray [D-CO-3] 12/14/1982
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-24] 12/21/1982
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 12/21/1982