Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11]* 07/28/1981
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 07/28/1981
Rep. Fenwick, Millicent H. [R-NJ-5]* 07/28/1981
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 07/28/1981
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 09/15/1981
Rep. Atkinson, Eugene V. [D-PA-25] 09/15/1981
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 09/15/1981
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 09/15/1981
Rep. Fary, John G. [D-IL-5] 09/15/1981
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 09/15/1981
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 09/15/1981
Rep. McDonald, Lawrence P. [D-GA-7] 09/15/1981
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-11] 09/15/1981
Rep. Hollenbeck, Harold C. [R-NJ-9] 09/15/1981
Rep. Forsythe, Edwin B. [R-NJ-6] 09/15/1981
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 09/15/1981
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/15/1981
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/15/1981
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-36] 09/15/1981
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 09/15/1981
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/15/1981
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-21] 09/15/1981
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-29] 09/15/1981
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 09/15/1981
Rep. Brodhead, William [D-MI-17] 09/15/1981
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/15/1981
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-15] 09/15/1981
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 09/15/1981
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 09/15/1981
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 09/15/1981
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-24] 09/15/1981
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 09/15/1981
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/15/1981
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-38] 09/15/1981
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-32] 09/15/1981
Rep. Benjamin, Adam, Jr. [D-IN-1] 09/15/1981
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 09/15/1981
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/15/1981
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 09/15/1981
Rep. Chisholm, Shirley [D-NY-12] 09/15/1981
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 09/15/1981
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 09/15/1981
Rep. Nelligan, James L. [R-PA-11] 09/15/1981
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 09/15/1981
Rep. O'Brien, George M. [R-IL-17] 09/15/1981
Rep. Smith, Joseph F. [D-PA-3] 09/15/1981
Rep. Marks, Marc L. [R-PA-24] 09/15/1981
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 09/15/1981
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 09/15/1981
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 09/15/1981
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-34] 09/15/1981
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3] 09/15/1981
Rep. Weber, Ed [R-OH-9] 09/15/1981
Rep. Blanchard, James [D-MI-18] 09/15/1981
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-25] 09/15/1981
Rep. Fiedler, Bobbi [R-CA-21] 09/15/1981
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 09/15/1981
Rep. Ratchford, William R. [D-CT-5] 09/15/1981
Rep. Corcoran, Tom [R-IL-15] 09/15/1981
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 09/15/1981
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 09/15/1981
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/15/1981
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/15/1981
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-18] 09/15/1981
Rep. LeBoutillier, John [R-NY-6] 09/15/1981
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 09/15/1981
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-7] 11/12/1981
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-24] 11/12/1981
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-27] 11/12/1981
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 11/12/1981
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-17] 11/12/1981
Rep. Shannon, James M. [D-MA-5] 11/12/1981
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 11/12/1981
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 11/12/1981
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 11/12/1981
Rep. Goldwater, Barry, Jr. [R-CA-20] 11/12/1981
Rep. Ferraro, Geraldine A. [D-NY-9] 12/11/1981
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-7] 12/11/1981
Rep. Santini, James D. [D-NV-98] 12/11/1981
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 12/11/1981
Rep. Pritchard, Joel [R-WA-1] 12/11/1981
Rep. Mottl, Ronald M. [D-OH-23] 12/11/1981
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 12/11/1981
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-14] 12/11/1981
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 01/28/1982
Rep. Stratton, Samuel S. [D-NY-28] 01/28/1982
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-22] 01/28/1982
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-26] 01/28/1982
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-12] 01/28/1982
Rep. Carman, Gregory W. [R-NY-3] 01/28/1982
Rep. Bowen, David R. [D-MS-2] 04/20/1982
Rep. Heckler, Margaret M. [R-MA-10] 04/20/1982
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-35] 04/20/1982