Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-37]* 10/21/1981
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6]* 10/21/1981
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 10/21/1981
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 10/21/1981
Rep. D'Amours, Norman E. [D-NH-1]* 10/21/1981
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 10/21/1981
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7]* 10/21/1981
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-15]* 10/21/1981
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-21]* 10/21/1981
Rep. Harkin, Tom [D-IA-5]* 10/21/1981
Rep. Hollenbeck, Harold C. [R-NJ-9]* 10/21/1981
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large]* 10/21/1981
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 10/21/1981
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 10/21/1981
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 10/21/1981
Rep. Moffett, Toby [D-CT-6]* 10/21/1981
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-17]* 10/21/1981
Rep. Richmond, Frederick W. [D-NY-14]* 10/21/1981
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 10/21/1981
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 10/21/1981
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 10/21/1981
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-16]* 10/21/1981
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 10/21/1981
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 10/21/1981
Rep. Pritchard, Joel [R-WA-1]* 10/21/1981
Rep. Fenwick, Millicent H. [R-NJ-5]* 10/21/1981
Rep. DeNardis, Lawrence J. [R-CT-3]* 10/21/1981
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-29]* 10/21/1981
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5] 11/20/1981
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 11/20/1981
Rep. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN-4] 11/20/1981
Rep. Bingham, Jonathan B. [D-NY-22] 11/20/1981
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-11] 11/20/1981
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 11/20/1981
Rep. Erdahl, Arlen [R-MN-1] 11/20/1981
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 11/20/1981
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 11/20/1981
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-20] 11/20/1981
Rep. Shannon, James M. [D-MA-5] 11/20/1981
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 11/20/1981
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 11/20/1981
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 11/20/1981
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 11/20/1981
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 11/20/1981
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 11/20/1981
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 11/20/1981
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-26] 11/20/1981
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 11/20/1981
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 11/20/1981
Rep. Burton, John [D-CA-5] 11/20/1981
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/20/1981
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-24] 11/20/1981
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-13] 11/20/1981
Rep. Reuss, Henry S. [D-WI-5] 11/20/1981
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 11/20/1981
Rep. Coyne, James K. [R-PA-8] 11/20/1981
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 11/20/1981
Rep. Rosenthal, Benjamin S. [D-NY-8] 11/20/1981
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-39] 11/20/1981
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 11/20/1981
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2] 11/20/1981
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/20/1981
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 11/20/1981
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 11/20/1981
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 11/20/1981
Rep. Minish, Joseph G. [D-NJ-11] 11/20/1981
Rep. Emery, David F. [R-ME-1] 11/20/1981
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-18] 11/20/1981
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 11/20/1981
Rep. Fithian, Floyd J. [D-IN-2] 11/20/1981
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-25] 12/14/1981
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-12] 12/14/1981
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-19] 12/14/1981
Rep. Ferraro, Geraldine A. [D-NY-9] 12/14/1981
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 12/14/1981
Rep. Chisholm, Shirley [D-NY-12] 12/14/1981
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-12] 12/14/1981
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 12/14/1981
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-7] 12/14/1981
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 12/14/1981
Rep. Ratchford, William R. [D-CT-5] 12/14/1981
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 12/14/1981
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 12/14/1981
Rep. Patterson, Jerry M. [D-CA-38] 12/14/1981
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 12/14/1981
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 01/26/1982
Rep. Lujan, Manuel, Jr. [R-NM-1] 01/26/1982
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-8] 01/26/1982
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 01/26/1982
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 01/26/1982
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 01/26/1982
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 01/26/1982
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 01/27/1982
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 01/27/1982
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 01/28/1982
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 01/28/1982
Rep. Danielson, George E. [D-CA-30] 01/28/1982
Rep. Shamansky, Bob [D-OH-12] 02/09/1982
Rep. Smith, Joseph F. [D-PA-3] 02/09/1982
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2] 02/09/1982
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-1] 02/09/1982
Rep. Heftel, Cecil [D-HI-1] 02/09/1982
Rep. Fary, John G. [D-IL-5] 02/09/1982
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 02/09/1982
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 02/09/1982
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 02/09/1982
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-22] 02/09/1982
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 03/10/1982
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 03/10/1982
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 03/10/1982
Rep. Heckler, Margaret M. [R-MA-10] 03/10/1982
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 03/17/1982
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3] 03/30/1982
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/30/1982
Rep. Zeferetti, Leo C. [D-NY-15] 05/19/1982
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 05/19/1982
Rep. Mitchell, Donald J. [R-NY-31] 05/21/1982
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-15] 05/21/1982
Rep. Peyser, Peter A. [R-NY-23] 05/25/1982
Rep. Forsythe, Edwin B. [R-NJ-6] 06/16/1982