Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weber, Ed [R-OH-9]* 11/12/1981
Rep. LeBoutillier, John [R-NY-6] 01/27/1982
Rep. Pritchard, Joel [R-WA-1] 01/27/1982
Rep. Rosenthal, Benjamin S. [D-NY-8] 01/27/1982
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 01/27/1982
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-25] 01/27/1982
Rep. Siljander, Mark D. [R-MI-4] 01/27/1982
Rep. Smith, Joseph F. [D-PA-3] 01/27/1982
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-32] 01/27/1982
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 01/27/1982
Rep. Forsythe, Edwin B. [R-NJ-6] 01/27/1982
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 01/27/1982
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-16] 01/27/1982
Rep. Brodhead, William [D-MI-17] 01/27/1982
Rep. Kramer, Ken [R-CO-5] 01/27/1982
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-13] 01/27/1982
Rep. Smith, Albert L., Jr. [R-AL-6] 01/27/1982
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-19] 01/27/1982
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 01/27/1982
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-34] 01/27/1982
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 01/27/1982
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 01/27/1982
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 01/27/1982
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-17] 01/27/1982
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/27/1982
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 01/27/1982
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 01/27/1982
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-35] 01/27/1982
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 01/27/1982
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-11] 01/27/1982
Rep. Kogovsek, Ray [D-CO-3] 01/27/1982
Rep. Dougherty, Charles F. [R-PA-4] 01/27/1982
Rep. Corcoran, Tom [R-IL-15] 01/27/1982
Rep. Benjamin, Adam, Jr. [D-IN-1] 01/27/1982
Rep. Fiedler, Bobbi [R-CA-21] 01/27/1982
Rep. Mottl, Ronald M. [D-OH-23] 01/27/1982
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 01/27/1982
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 01/27/1982
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-24] 02/02/1982
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 02/02/1982
Rep. Shannon, James M. [D-MA-5] 02/02/1982
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 02/02/1982
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 02/02/1982
Rep. Harkin, Tom [D-IA-5] 02/02/1982
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 02/03/1982
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-24] 02/03/1982
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 02/03/1982
Rep. Long, Clarence D. [D-MD-2] 02/03/1982
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 02/03/1982
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 02/03/1982
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/03/1982
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/03/1982
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2] 02/03/1982
Rep. Collins, James M. [R-TX-3] 02/03/1982
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 02/03/1982
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 02/09/1982
Rep. Won Pat, Antonio B. [D-GU-At Large] 02/09/1982
Rep. McDonald, Lawrence P. [D-GA-7] 02/09/1982
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 02/09/1982
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 02/09/1982
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-14] 02/09/1982
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 02/09/1982
Rep. Staton, David Michael [R-WV-3] 02/09/1982
Rep. Ferraro, Geraldine A. [D-NY-9] 02/09/1982
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 02/09/1982
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-10] 02/09/1982
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 02/09/1982
Rep. Ashbrook, John M. [R-OH-17] 02/09/1982
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-6] 02/09/1982
Rep. Fenwick, Millicent H. [R-NJ-5] 02/09/1982
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-13] 02/09/1982
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-27] 03/16/1982
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 03/16/1982
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-15] 03/16/1982
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 03/16/1982
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 03/16/1982
Rep. Evans, Billy Lee [D-GA-8] 03/16/1982
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/16/1982