Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A resolution expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that no further reductions should be made in the funding currently available for fiscal year 1983 for programs administered under the Older Americans Act of 1965.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/19/1982Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/28/1982Referred to Subcommittee on Human Resources.
05/19/1982Referred to House Committee on Education and Labor.
05/19/1982Introduced in House

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-14]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-12]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Andrews, Ike [D-NC-4]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Mottl, Ronald M. [D-OH-23]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-24]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Rosenthal, Benjamin S. [D-NY-8]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Smith, Joseph F. [D-PA-3]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-20]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-8]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 05/24/1982
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 05/24/1982
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 05/24/1982
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-27] 05/24/1982
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 06/15/1982
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-13] 06/15/1982
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/15/1982
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/15/1982
Rep. Bingham, Jonathan B. [D-NY-22] 06/15/1982
Rep. Erdahl, Arlen [R-MN-1] 06/15/1982
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-11] 06/15/1982
Rep. Napier, John L. [R-SC-6] 06/15/1982
Rep. Corrada, Baltasar [I-PR-At Large] 06/15/1982
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/15/1982
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 06/15/1982
Rep. Chisholm, Shirley [D-NY-12] 06/15/1982
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 06/15/1982
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 06/15/1982
Rep. LeBoutillier, John [R-NY-6] 06/15/1982
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 06/15/1982
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 06/15/1982
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-24] 06/15/1982
Rep. Deckard, Joel [R-IN-8] 06/15/1982
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 06/15/1982
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 06/15/1982
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-25] 07/12/1982
Rep. Shamansky, Bob [D-OH-12] 07/12/1982
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 07/12/1982
Rep. Evans, Billy Lee [D-GA-8] 07/12/1982
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 07/12/1982
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 07/12/1982

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor05/19/1982 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Human Resources05/28/1982 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.473.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.473. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/19/1982)

Expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that no further reductions should be made in the funding currently available for FY 1983 for programs administered under the Older Americans Act of 1965.