Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Heckler, Margaret M. [R-MA-10]* 08/18/1982
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 08/18/1982
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-7]* 08/18/1982
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1]* 08/18/1982
Rep. Kramer, Ken [R-CO-5]* 08/18/1982
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 08/18/1982
Rep. Won Pat, Antonio B. [D-GU-At Large]* 08/18/1982
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 08/18/1982
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 08/18/1982
Rep. Benjamin, Adam, Jr. [D-IN-1]* 08/18/1982
Rep. Rosenthal, Benjamin S. [D-NY-8]* 08/18/1982
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 08/18/1982
Rep. LeBoutillier, John [R-NY-6]* 08/18/1982
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-12]* 08/18/1982
Rep. Fenwick, Millicent H. [R-NJ-5]* 08/18/1982
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-8]* 08/18/1982
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 08/18/1982
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7]* 08/18/1982
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5]* 08/18/1982
Rep. Bingham, Jonathan B. [D-NY-22]* 08/18/1982
Rep. Albosta, Donald J. [D-MI-10]* 08/18/1982
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 08/18/1982
Rep. Corcoran, Tom [R-IL-15]* 08/18/1982
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 08/18/1982
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-16]* 08/18/1982
Rep. Derwinski, Edward J. [R-IL-4]* 08/18/1982
Rep. Dougherty, Charles F. [R-PA-4]* 08/18/1982
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 08/18/1982
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 08/18/1982
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-32] 08/19/1982
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 08/19/1982
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 08/19/1982
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-25] 09/08/1982
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 09/08/1982
Rep. Shamansky, Bob [D-OH-12] 09/21/1982
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 09/28/1982