Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4]* 07/22/1982
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-1] 08/16/1982
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-16] 08/16/1982
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 08/16/1982
Rep. Chisholm, Shirley [D-NY-12] 08/16/1982
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 08/16/1982
Rep. Patterson, Jerry M. [D-CA-38] 08/16/1982
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-34] 08/16/1982
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 08/16/1982
Rep. Bailey, Donald A. [D-PA-21] 08/16/1982
Rep. Ratchford, William R. [D-CT-5] 08/16/1982
Rep. DeNardis, Lawrence J. [R-CT-3] 08/16/1982
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 08/16/1982
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-21] 08/16/1982
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-23] 08/16/1982
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 08/16/1982
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 08/16/1982
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 08/16/1982
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 08/16/1982
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 08/16/1982
Rep. Dougherty, Charles F. [R-PA-4] 08/16/1982
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 08/16/1982
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 08/16/1982
Rep. Shamansky, Bob [D-OH-12] 08/16/1982
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 08/16/1982
Rep. Erdahl, Arlen [R-MN-1] 08/16/1982
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 08/16/1982
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 08/16/1982
Rep. Coyne, James K. [R-PA-8] 08/16/1982
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 08/16/1982
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 08/16/1982
Rep. Rhodes, John J. [R-AZ-1] 08/16/1982
Rep. Moffett, Toby [D-CT-6] 08/16/1982
Rep. Clausen, Don H. [R-CA-2] 08/16/1982
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 08/16/1982
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 08/16/1982
Rep. Heckler, Margaret M. [R-MA-10] 08/16/1982
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 08/16/1982
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 08/16/1982
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 08/16/1982
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 08/16/1982
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-8] 08/19/1982
Rep. Pritchard, Joel [R-WA-1] 08/19/1982
Rep. Mattox, James A. [D-TX-5] 08/19/1982
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 08/19/1982
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 08/19/1982
Rep. Burton, John [D-CA-5] 08/19/1982
Rep. Richmond, Frederick W. [D-NY-14] 08/19/1982
Rep. Mottl, Ronald M. [D-OH-23] 08/19/1982
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 08/19/1982
Rep. Brodhead, William [D-MI-17] 08/19/1982
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-17] 08/19/1982
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 08/19/1982
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 08/19/1982
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 08/19/1982
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-7] 08/19/1982
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 08/19/1982
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 08/19/1982
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 08/19/1982
Rep. Stanton, J. William [R-OH-11] 08/19/1982
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-10] 09/16/1982
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 09/16/1982
Rep. Peyser, Peter A. [R-NY-23] 09/16/1982
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 09/16/1982
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 09/16/1982
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 09/16/1982
Rep. Bingham, Jonathan B. [D-NY-22] 09/16/1982
Rep. McClory, Robert [R-IL-13] 09/16/1982
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5] 09/16/1982
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 09/16/1982
Rep. Dunn, Jim [R-MI-6] 09/16/1982
Rep. Stratton, Samuel S. [D-NY-28] 09/16/1982
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/16/1982
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 09/16/1982
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 09/16/1982
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 09/16/1982
Rep. Railsback, Thomas F. [R-IL-19] 09/16/1982
Rep. Corrada, Baltasar [I-PR-At Large] 09/16/1982
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 09/16/1982
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 09/16/1982
Rep. Long, Clarence D. [D-MD-2] 09/16/1982
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 09/16/1982
Rep. Won Pat, Antonio B. [D-GU-At Large] 09/16/1982
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/23/1982
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 09/23/1982
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 09/23/1982
Rep. Martin, James G. [R-NC-9] 09/23/1982
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 09/23/1982
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 09/23/1982
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 09/23/1982
Rep. Butler, M. Caldwell [R-VA-6] 09/23/1982
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 09/23/1982
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 09/23/1982
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 09/23/1982
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 09/23/1982
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 09/23/1982
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 09/23/1982
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 09/23/1982
Rep. Conable, Barber B., Jr. [R-NY-35] 09/23/1982
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 09/23/1982
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 09/30/1982
Rep. Zablocki, Clement J. [D-WI-4] 09/30/1982
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 09/30/1982
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 09/30/1982
Rep. Edwards, Jack [R-AL-1] 09/30/1982
Rep. Washington, Harold [D-IL-1] 09/30/1982
Rep. McCloskey, Paul N., Jr. [R-CA-12] 09/30/1982
Rep. Atkinson, Eugene V. [D-PA-25] 09/30/1982
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-32] 09/30/1982
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 09/30/1982
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 09/30/1982
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 09/30/1982
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-20] 09/30/1982
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 09/30/1982
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 09/30/1982
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-26] 09/30/1982
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 09/30/1982
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 09/30/1982
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 09/30/1982
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 09/30/1982
Rep. Rosenthal, Benjamin S. [D-NY-8] 09/30/1982
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 09/30/1982
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-24] 09/30/1982
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 09/30/1982
Rep. Fenwick, Millicent H. [R-NJ-5] 09/30/1982
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-38] 12/17/1982
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-11] 12/17/1982
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 12/17/1982
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-25] 12/17/1982
Rep. Bolling, Richard [D-MO-5] 12/17/1982
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 12/17/1982
Rep. Reuss, Henry S. [D-WI-5] 12/17/1982
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 12/17/1982