Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 06/15/1981
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 06/15/1981
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 06/15/1981
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT]* 06/15/1981
Sen. Randolph, Jennings [D-WV]* 06/15/1981
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 06/15/1981
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 06/15/1981
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 06/15/1981
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 06/15/1981
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 07/21/1981
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/21/1981
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 07/21/1981
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/11/1981
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 09/11/1981
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/11/1981
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 09/11/1981
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 09/29/1981
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 10/19/1981
Sen. Tsongas, Paul E. [D-MA] 10/19/1981
Sen. Schmitt, Harrison H. [R-NM] 10/21/1981
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 10/28/1981
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 01/28/1982
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 01/28/1982
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH] 01/28/1982
Sen. Armstrong, William L. [R-CO] 03/04/1982
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 03/24/1982
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 04/27/1982
Sen. Abdnor, James [R-SD] 04/29/1982
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/15/1982
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 06/15/1982
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 06/17/1982
Sen. Jackson, Henry M. [D-WA] 06/23/1982
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/24/1982
Sen. Eagleton, Thomas F. [D-MO] 06/29/1982
Sen. Brady, Nicholas [R-NJ] 06/29/1982
Sen. Proxmire, William [D-WI] 06/29/1982
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 06/29/1982
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 06/29/1982
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 06/29/1982
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 06/30/1982
Sen. Andrews, Mark [R-ND] 06/30/1982
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 06/30/1982
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 07/01/1982
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 08/02/1982
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH] 08/02/1982
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 08/02/1982
Sen. Goldwater, Barry [R-AZ] 08/02/1982
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 08/05/1982
Sen. Percy, Charles H. [R-IL] 08/05/1982
Sen. Hayakawa, Samuel Ichiye [R-CA] 08/11/1982
Sen. Mathias, Charles McC., Jr. [R-MD] 08/11/1982
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 08/11/1982
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 08/13/1982
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 09/09/1982
Sen. Mattingly, Mack [R-GA] 09/15/1982
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 09/16/1982
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/22/1982
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 09/23/1982