Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT]* 05/06/1981
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 05/06/1981
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 05/06/1981
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/06/1981
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL]* 05/06/1981
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/06/1981
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 05/06/1981
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 05/06/1981
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 05/06/1981
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/06/1981
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 05/06/1981
Sen. Jackson, Henry M. [D-WA]* 05/06/1981
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 05/06/1981
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 05/06/1981
Sen. Percy, Charles H. [R-IL]* 05/06/1981
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH]* 05/06/1981
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 05/06/1981
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 05/06/1981
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 05/06/1981
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 05/06/1981
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT]* 05/06/1981
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 05/06/1981
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 05/07/1981
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 05/12/1981
Sen. Jepsen, Roger W. [R-IA] 05/21/1981
Sen. Schmitt, Harrison H. [R-NM] 06/01/1981
Sen. Huddleston, Walter (Dee) [D-KY] 06/03/1981
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 06/03/1981
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/08/1981
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 06/09/1981
Sen. Hart, Gary W. [D-CO] 06/10/1981
Sen. Hawkins, Paula [R-FL] 06/11/1981
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 06/15/1981
Sen. Mattingly, Mack [R-GA] 06/18/1981
Sen. Hayakawa, Samuel Ichiye [R-CA] 06/19/1981
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 06/23/1981
Sen. Goldwater, Barry [R-AZ] 06/24/1981
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 07/08/1981
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 07/09/1981
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 07/13/1981
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 07/21/1981
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 07/31/1981
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 09/09/1981
Sen. Armstrong, William L. [R-CO] 09/09/1981
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 09/10/1981
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 09/22/1981
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 10/05/1981
Sen. East, John P. [R-NC] 10/05/1981
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 10/07/1981
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 10/14/1981
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT] 10/19/1981
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 10/22/1981
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 10/26/1981
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH] 10/28/1981
Sen. Zorinsky, Edward [D-NE] 10/29/1981
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 11/03/1981
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 11/04/1981
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 11/12/1981
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 11/18/1981
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN] 11/18/1981
Sen. Denton, Jeremiah [R-AL] 12/01/1981
Sen. Long, Russell B. [D-LA] 12/08/1981
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 12/09/1981
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 12/10/1981
Sen. Randolph, Jennings [D-WV] 12/11/1981