Summary: S.1191 — 97th Congress (1981-1982)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Senate agreed to House amendment with amendment (09/30/1981)

(Senate agreed to House amendment with an amendment)

Amends the Fishermen's Protective Act of 1967 to direct the Secretary of Commerce to deposit or invest fees collected from certain United States fishing vessel owners which are not currently needed for reimbursements for losses incurred due to seizures of vessels by a foreign country.

Extends the authority to make such reimbursements through October 1, 1984.

Extends from January 1, 1983 (January 1, 1982 in the case of seagoing barges) through January 1, 1988, the current exemption from specified inspection requirements for cannery tender vessels, fishing tender vessels. seagoing barges under 5,000 gross tons, and other vessels used in processing or assembling fishery products in the fisheries of the States of Oregon, Washington, and Alaska.

Declares nonnavigable the portion of the Green River in the State of Washington lying upstream from the State Highway 516 bridge which is in existence on the date of enactment.