Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the provisions of title 39, United States Code, relating to the use of the frank, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
10/26/1981Became Public Law No: 97-69.
10/26/1981Signed by President.
10/15/1981Presented to President.
10/13/1981Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
07/20/1981Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
07/17/1981Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Roth favorably with amendments. With written report No. 97-155.
05/19/1981Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/26/1981Became Public Law No: 97-69.
10/26/1981Signed by President.
10/15/1981SenatePresented to President.
10/14/1981SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
10/13/1981HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
10/13/1981HouseCalled up by House by Unanimous Consent.
07/21/1981HouseReferred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
07/20/1981SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
07/17/1981SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 203.
07/17/1981SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Roth favorably with amendments. With written report No. 97-155.
07/15/1981SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs received executive comment from CBO.
07/09/1981SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
06/16/1981SenateSubcommittee on Civil Service and General Services. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Civil Service, Post Office, and General Services
06/04/1981SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs requested executive comment from U.S. Postal Service.
05/27/1981SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Civil Service and General Services.
Action By: Committee on Governmental Affairs
05/19/1981SenateRead second time and referred to Senate Committee on Governmental Affairs.

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR]* 05/19/1981
Sen. Andrews, Mark [R-ND]* 05/19/1981

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Governmental Affairs05/19/1981 Referred to
07/09/1981 Markup by
07/17/1981 Reported by S.Rept 97-155
Senate Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Civil Service, Post Office, and General Services05/27/1981 Referred to
06/16/1981 Hearings by
House Post Office and Civil Service07/21/1981 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.1224.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1224. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (07/20/1981)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Repeals a provision of Federal law which allows Members of Congress to send messages expressing personal condolences or congratulations for a personal distinction as franked mail. Allows a Member or Member-elect to include greetings from a family member as a brief reference in franked mail.

Extends from 28 to 60 days the period preceding an election during which a Member or Member-elect running for any public office may not send any mass mailing as franked mail. Prohibits any Member of or Member-elect to the House who is running for another public office from using his or her franking privilege for any mass mailing directed to any area covered by such public office which is not within the Member's or Member-elect's congressional district. Exempts from such restrictions any mass mailings relating to the regular business of any committee or commission of Congress or the Democratic conference or the Republican caucus of either House.

Permits any Member of or Member-elect to Congress (currently restricted to Members and Members-elect of the House) to send franked mail with a simplified form of address within his or her congressional district or State by the most economical means practicable. Directs the Senate Committee on Rules and Administration and the House Committee on Congressional Mailing Standards to prescribe regulations governing such mail, including regulations limiting the number of mailings.

Requires Members and Members-elect of the House of Representatives to submit samples of mail to be franked to the House Commission on Congressional Mailing Standards for an advisory opinion on compliance with franking standards. Authorizes the Senate Select Committee on Ethics to require Members and Members-elect of the Senate to obtain its advisory opinion on franked mailings.

Prohibits a Member-elect from sending as franked mail any mail for which the printing costs are not paid from funds appropriated by Congress, excluding public service material that is purely instructional or informational and is frankable in content.

Revises the time period following the end of the terms of office of Members and certain officers of Congress and the Vice President during which such officials may send and receive public documents as franked mail, and during which such former Members of Congress may send seeds and agricultural reports as franked mail.

Extends to surviving relatives the franking privilege of the spouse of a Member of Congress who died in office in the event there is no surviving spouse (such privilege covers only mail relating to the death of such Member mailed within 180 days of death).

Extends the authority of the House Commission on Congressional Mailing Standards to cover advisory opinions involving any non-criminal law regarding franked mail. Authorizes the Commission to issue regulations or investigate franking privilege violations in connection with any other Federal law (other than criminal statutes) or in connection with any rule of the House relating to franked mail. Extends the Commission's jurisdiction over franking violations to include complaints against former Members and officers of the House.