Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure with respect to examination of prospective jurors.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/29/1981Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date
09/28/1982Subcommittee on Criminal Law. Approved for full committee consideration with an amendment favorably.
Action By: Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Criminal Law
08/20/1982Committee on Judiciary received executive comment from Administrative Office of the U.S. Courts.
05/21/1982Subcommittee on Courts. Approved for full committee consideration with an amendment favorably.
Action By: Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts
11/16/1981Subcommittee on Courts. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts
08/10/1981Committee on Judiciary requested executive comment from Administrative Office of the U.S. Courts.
07/31/1981Referred to Subcommittee on Courts.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/31/1981Referred to Subcommittee on Criminal Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/29/1981Read second time and referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 07/29/1981
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 09/21/1981
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 09/21/1981
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 12/09/1981
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/02/1982

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary07/29/1981 Referred to
Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Criminal Law07/31/1981 Referred to
09/28/1982 Markup by
09/28/1982 Reported by
Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts07/31/1981 Referred to
11/16/1981 Hearings by
05/21/1982 Markup by
05/21/1982 Reported by

No related bill information was received for S.1532.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1532. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/29/1981)

Amends Rule 24 of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure and Rule 47 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to entitle the defendant and Government attorney in a criminal case, or the parties in a civil case, to conduct the examination of prospective jurors, subject to reasonable limitations imposed by the court. Permits the court to conduct its own additional examination (currently, examination by the defendant, Government, or parties is discretionary with the court).