Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 10/01/1981
Sen. Hayakawa, Samuel Ichiye [R-CA] 10/23/1981
Sen. Laxalt, Paul D. [R-NV] 10/23/1981
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 10/30/1981
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 12/02/1981
Sen. Mattingly, Mack [R-GA] 12/02/1981
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 12/02/1981
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 12/11/1981
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 12/11/1981
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT] 01/26/1982
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 01/26/1982
Sen. Mathias, Charles McC., Jr. [R-MD] 01/26/1982
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 02/09/1982
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 02/23/1982
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 02/23/1982
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 03/10/1982
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 03/11/1982
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/16/1982
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/18/1982
Sen. Schmitt, Harrison H. [R-NM] 03/23/1982
Sen. Jackson, Henry M. [D-WA] 03/29/1982
Sen. Tsongas, Paul E. [D-MA] 03/29/1982
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/30/1982
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 04/01/1982
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 04/01/1982
Sen. Hawkins, Paula [R-FL] 04/26/1982
Sen. Jepsen, Roger W. [R-IA] 05/18/1982
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 05/25/1982
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 05/26/1982
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 06/24/1982
Sen. Hart, Gary W. [D-CO] 07/19/1982
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/19/1982
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 07/19/1982
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 07/22/1982
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/30/1982
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 08/03/1982
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID] 08/13/1982
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN] 08/13/1982
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 08/17/1982
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/13/1982
Sen. Percy, Charles H. [R-IL] 09/28/1982