Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 12/11/1981
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/17/1982
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 03/17/1982
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 03/17/1982
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/17/1982
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 03/17/1982
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 03/18/1982
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 03/18/1982
Sen. Cannon, Howard W. [D-NV] 03/18/1982
Sen. Abdnor, James [R-SD] 03/18/1982
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 03/18/1982
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/18/1982
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/18/1982
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 03/23/1982
Sen. Mattingly, Mack [R-GA] 03/23/1982
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 03/23/1982
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 03/25/1982
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/25/1982
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 03/25/1982
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/25/1982
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH] 03/30/1982
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/20/1982
Sen. Zorinsky, Edward [D-NE] 04/27/1982
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT] 05/24/1982
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 05/24/1982
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 06/15/1982
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/17/1982
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 06/17/1982
Sen. Randolph, Jennings [D-WV] 07/13/1982
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 07/13/1982
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT] 07/14/1982
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 07/14/1982
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/16/1982
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/20/1982
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 07/26/1982
Sen. Jackson, Henry M. [D-WA] 07/28/1982
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 07/30/1982
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 07/30/1982
Sen. Andrews, Mark [R-ND] 08/05/1982
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 08/05/1982
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 08/17/1982
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/08/1982
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 09/08/1982
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 09/08/1982
Sen. Jepsen, Roger W. [R-IA] 09/08/1982
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 11/30/1982
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 11/30/1982
Sen. Huddleston, Walter (Dee) [D-KY] 11/30/1982
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 11/30/1982
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH] 11/30/1982
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 11/30/1982
Sen. Hawkins, Paula [R-FL] 12/15/1982
Sen. Hart, Gary W. [D-CO] 12/20/1982