Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Jepsen, Roger W. [R-IA]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Andrews, Mark [R-ND]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Cannon, Howard W. [D-NV]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 01/29/1981
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Denton, Jeremiah [R-AL]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Eagleton, Thomas F. [D-MO]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Goldwater, Barry [R-AZ]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Hayakawa, Samuel Ichiye [R-CA]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Huddleston, Walter (Dee) [D-KY]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Mathias, Charles McC., Jr. [R-MD]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Mattingly, Mack [R-GA]* 01/29/1981
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Proxmire, William [D-WI]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Randolph, Jennings [D-WV]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Schmitt, Harrison H. [R-NM]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Tsongas, Paul E. [D-MA]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Williams, Harrison A., Jr. [D-NJ]* 01/29/1981
Sen. Armstrong, William L. [R-CO] 02/06/1981
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 04/30/1981
Sen. Hart, Gary W. [D-CO] 04/30/1981
Sen. East, John P. [R-NC] 05/08/1981
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/17/1981
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 06/17/1981
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 07/10/1981
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 07/10/1981
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 07/10/1981
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/25/1981
Sen. Laxalt, Paul D. [R-NV] 10/28/1981
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH] 11/17/1981
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 02/02/1982
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 02/24/1982
Sen. Long, Russell B. [D-LA] 03/08/1982
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT] 04/21/1982
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 04/21/1982
Sen. Abdnor, James [R-SD] 05/11/1982