There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the Secretary of Agriculture to convey certain National Forest System Lands, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (10)

Date Actions Overview
01/12/1983Became Public Law No: 97-465.
01/12/1983Signed by President.
01/03/1983Presented to President.
12/21/1982Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
12/21/1982House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
12/21/1982House Committee on Agriculture Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
08/19/1982Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
07/01/1982Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator McClure with amendments. With written report No. 97-490.
04/19/1982Committee on Agriculture. Reported to Senate by Senator Helms with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 97-332.
03/12/1981Introduced in Senate

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/12/1983Became Public Law No: 97-465.
01/12/1983Signed by President.
01/03/1983SenatePresented to President.
01/03/1983SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
12/21/1982HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
12/21/1982HouseCalled up by House by Unanimous Consent.
12/21/1982HouseHouse Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
12/21/1982HouseHouse Committee on Agriculture Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
12/02/1982HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Public Lands and National Parks
09/27/1982HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Public Lands and National Parks.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
09/08/1982HouseReferred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
09/08/1982HouseReferred to House Committee on Agriculture.
08/19/1982SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
07/01/1982SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 700.
07/01/1982SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator McClure with amendments. With written report No. 97-490.
06/30/1982SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
06/24/1982SenateSubcommittee on Public Lands and Reserved Water. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Reserved Water and Resource Conservation
05/27/1982SenateRereferred to Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. That, if the Energy Committee has not reported the bill by July 2, 1982, it shall be automatically discharged from further consideration of the bill.
04/19/1982SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 482.
04/19/1982SenateCommittee on Agriculture. Reported to Senate by Senator Helms with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 97-332.
03/31/1982SenateCommittee on Agriculture. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
10/22/1981SenateSubcommittee on Forestry. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry Subcommittee on Forestry, Water Resources, and Environment
10/21/1981SenateCommittee on Agriculture received executive comment from Agriculture Department. Favorable, if amended.
03/17/1981SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry
03/17/1981SenateCommittee on Agriculture requested executive comment from Agriculture Department.
03/12/1981SenateRead second time and referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture.

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 01/28/1982
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 03/02/1982
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 06/09/1982

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry03/12/1981 Referred to
03/31/1982 Markup by
04/19/1982 Reported by S.Rept 97-332
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry Subcommittee on Forestry, Water Resources, and Environment03/17/1981 Referred to
10/22/1981 Hearings by
House Agriculture09/08/1982 Referred to
12/21/1982 Discharged from
House Interior and Insular Affairs09/08/1982 Referred to
12/21/1982 Discharged from
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Public Lands and National Parks09/27/1982 Referred to
12/02/1982 Hearings by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources05/27/1982 Re-Referred to
06/30/1982 Markup by
07/01/1982 Reported by S.Rept 97-490
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Reserved Water and Resource Conservation06/24/1982 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for S.705.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.705. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (08/19/1982)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Authorizes the Secretary of Agriculture to convey certain National Forest System (System) lands which cannot be practicably conveyed under any other authority of the Secretary and: (1) whose individual value is not more than $150,000; (2) are 40 acres or less and interspersed with or adjacent to lands already transferred out of Federal ownership under mining laws; (3) are ten acres or less and have been innocently encroached upon due to an erroneous survey or other land description; or (4) are road rights-of-way no longer needed by the Government.

Directs the Secretary to retain public interest rights (scenic, wildlife, recreation, and public access) in any conveyance of System lands.

States that any person receiving: (1) such land shall pay the associated conveyance costs; or (2) a road right-of-way shall reimburse the Government for improvements. Permits the Secretary to waive these provisions.

States that: (1) conveyances of road rights-of- way shall be used or maintained according to State or local laws; and (2) nothing in this title authorizes conveyances of public lands within the National Wilderness Preservation System, the National Wild and Scenic Rivers System, the National Trails System, or the National Forest Monuments. Prohibits the sale, but not other forms of conveyance, of Federal lands in National Recreation Areas.

Amends Federal law to permit State, county, and local governmental bodies to participate in System land exchanges (currently limited to public school authorities) to the extent that such lands: (1) are already in use by these bodies; and (2) are used for the same purposes.