Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Peace Corps Act Amendments of 1981

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize appropriations for the Peace Corps, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/01/1981Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
05/14/1981Committee on Foreign Relations. Provisions of measure incorporated into measure S. 1196 ordered to be reported.
05/13/1981Committee on Foreign Relations. Committee consideration and Mark Up Session held.
05/11/1981Committee on Foreign Relations. Committee consideration and Mark Up Session held.
05/06/1981Committee on Foreign Relations. Committee consideration and Mark Up Session held.
04/29/1981Committee on Foreign Relations. Hearings held.
04/27/1981S.Amdt.38 Referred to Senate Committee on Foreign Relations.
04/01/1981Read second time and referred to Senate Committee on Foreign Relations.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations04/01/1981 Referred to
04/29/1981 Hearings by
05/13/1981 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (13)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.848. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/01/1981)

Peace Corps Act Amendments of 1981 - Amends the Peace Corps Act to authorize appropriations for fiscal years 1982 and 1983.

Requires the Peace Corps to give particular attention to programs which tend to integrate disabled people into developing countries' national economies.

Removes present malpractice protection for Peace Corps volunteers. Applies the malpractice protection currently covering State Department personnel to Peace Corps volunteers and personnel.

Removes the applicability of the Mutual Defense Control Act of 1951 to the functions of the Peace Corps.