Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT]* 04/07/1981
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 04/07/1981
Sen. Huddleston, Walter (Dee) [D-KY]* 04/07/1981
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 04/07/1981
Sen. Hayakawa, Samuel Ichiye [R-CA]* 04/07/1981
Sen. Hart, Gary W. [D-CO] 07/14/1981
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 07/14/1981
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 07/14/1981
Sen. Tsongas, Paul E. [D-MA] 07/14/1981
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 07/14/1981
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 07/14/1981
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 07/14/1981
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 07/14/1981
Sen. Tower, John G. [R-TX] 07/14/1981
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/14/1981
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 07/14/1981
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/14/1981
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA] 07/14/1981
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 07/14/1981
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 07/14/1981
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 07/14/1981
Sen. Percy, Charles H. [R-IL] 07/14/1981
Sen. Goldwater, Barry [R-AZ] 07/14/1981
Sen. Zorinsky, Edward [D-NE] 07/14/1981
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 07/14/1981
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 07/14/1981
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 07/14/1981
Sen. Humphrey, Gordon J. [R-NH] 07/14/1981
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 07/14/1981
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/14/1981
Sen. Hawkins, Paula [R-FL] 07/14/1981
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 07/14/1981
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/14/1981
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 07/14/1981
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 07/14/1981
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 07/14/1981
Sen. Abdnor, James [R-SD] 07/14/1981
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 07/14/1981
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/14/1981
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 07/14/1981
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 07/14/1981
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT] 07/14/1981
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 07/14/1981
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 07/14/1981
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 07/14/1981
Sen. Williams, Harrison A., Jr. [D-NJ] 07/14/1981
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 07/14/1981
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 07/14/1981
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/14/1981
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/14/1981
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 07/14/1981
Sen. Cannon, Howard W. [D-NV] 07/14/1981
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 07/14/1981
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 07/14/1981
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 07/14/1981
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 07/14/1981
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 07/14/1981
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/14/1981
Sen. Mathias, Charles McC., Jr. [R-MD] 07/14/1981
Sen. Jepsen, Roger W. [R-IA] 07/14/1981
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 07/14/1981
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 07/14/1981
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 07/14/1981
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 07/14/1981
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 07/14/1981
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 07/14/1981
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/14/1981
Sen. Andrews, Mark [R-ND] 07/14/1981
Sen. Randolph, Jennings [D-WV] 07/14/1981
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 07/14/1981
Sen. East, John P. [R-NC] 07/14/1981
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS] 07/14/1981
Sen. Denton, Jeremiah [R-AL] 07/14/1981
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 07/14/1981
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/14/1981
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/14/1981
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 07/14/1981
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 07/14/1981
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 07/20/1981
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 07/23/1981
Sen. Mattingly, Mack [R-GA] 09/24/1981
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 09/24/1981
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 09/24/1981
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 09/25/1981

Show cosponsors who withdrew