Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Andrews, Mark [R-ND]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Cannon, Howard W. [D-NV]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Huddleston, Walter (Dee) [D-KY]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Jackson, Henry M. [D-WA]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Jepsen, Roger W. [R-IA]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Tsongas, Paul E. [D-MA]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Zorinsky, Edward [D-NE]* 09/16/1982
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 09/20/1982
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/20/1982
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 09/20/1982
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 09/29/1982
Sen. Eagleton, Thomas F. [D-MO] 09/30/1982
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 11/29/1982
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 11/29/1982
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 11/29/1982
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 11/29/1982
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS] 11/29/1982
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 11/29/1982
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 12/01/1982
Sen. Percy, Charles H. [R-IL] 12/01/1982
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 12/01/1982
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 12/02/1982
Sen. Randolph, Jennings [D-WV] 12/02/1982
Sen. Hart, Gary W. [D-CO] 12/06/1982
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 12/06/1982
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 12/09/1982
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 12/09/1982
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 12/09/1982
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 12/10/1982
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 12/14/1982