Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 09/17/1982
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 09/17/1982
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 09/17/1982
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 09/17/1982
Sen. Quayle, Dan [R-IN]* 09/17/1982
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 09/17/1982
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 09/17/1982
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 09/17/1982
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 09/17/1982
Sen. Huddleston, Walter (Dee) [D-KY]* 09/17/1982
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN]* 09/17/1982
Sen. Abdnor, James [R-SD]* 09/17/1982
Sen. Jepsen, Roger W. [R-IA] 09/20/1982
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 09/21/1982
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/21/1982
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 10/01/1982
Sen. Mathias, Charles McC., Jr. [R-MD] 11/29/1982
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 12/13/1982