Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution authorizing the President to proclaim March 16 of each year as "Freedom of Information Day".


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
03/10/1981Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
03/06/1981Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond favorably with an amendment and an amendment to the title and with a preamble. Without written report.
01/29/1981Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/13/1981HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
03/11/1981HouseReferred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
03/10/1981SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
03/06/1981SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 31.
03/06/1981SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond favorably with an amendment and an amendment to the title and with a preamble. Without written report.
03/06/1981SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
01/29/1981SenateRead second time and referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 02/06/1981
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/06/1981
Sen. Abdnor, James [R-SD]* 02/06/1981
Sen. Goldwater, Barry [R-AZ]* 02/06/1981
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 02/06/1981
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL]* 02/06/1981
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 02/06/1981
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 02/06/1981
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 02/06/1981
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 02/06/1981
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 02/06/1981
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 02/06/1981
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 02/19/1981
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 02/19/1981
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 02/19/1981
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT] 02/19/1981
Sen. Byrd, Harry F., Jr. [I-VA] 02/19/1981
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/19/1981
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 02/19/1981
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 02/19/1981
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN] 02/19/1981
Sen. Huddleston, Walter (Dee) [D-KY] 02/19/1981
Sen. Williams, Harrison A., Jr. [D-NJ] 02/19/1981
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/19/1981
Sen. Armstrong, William L. [R-CO] 02/19/1981
Sen. Schmitt, Harrison H. [R-NM] 02/19/1981
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 02/19/1981
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 02/19/1981
Sen. Jepsen, Roger W. [R-IA] 02/19/1981
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 02/19/1981
Sen. Tsongas, Paul E. [D-MA] 02/19/1981
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 02/19/1981
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 02/26/1981
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 02/26/1981
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/26/1981
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 02/26/1981

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary01/29/1981 Referred to
03/06/1981 Markup by
03/06/1981 Reported by
House Post Office and Civil Service03/11/1981 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population03/13/1981 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.J.Res.22.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.J.Res.22. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (03/10/1981)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Requests the President to designate March 16, 1981, as "Freedom of Information Day."