Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to proclaim March 21, 1983, as "National Agriculture Day."


Actions Overview (8)

Date
10/14/1982Became Public Law No: 97-318.
10/14/1982Signed by President.
10/04/1982Presented to President.
09/30/1982Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
09/30/1982House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/15/1982Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
09/14/1982Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
08/19/1982Introduced in Senate

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
10/14/1982Became Public Law No: 97-318.
10/14/1982Signed by President.
10/04/1982SenatePresented to President.
10/01/1982SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
09/30/1982HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
09/30/1982HouseCalled up by House by Unanimous Consent.
09/30/1982HouseHouse Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/20/1982HouseReferred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
09/15/1982SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
09/14/1982SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 787.
09/14/1982SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
09/14/1982SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
08/19/1982SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (54)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Huddleston, Walter (Dee) [D-KY]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Andrews, Mark [R-ND]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Armstrong, William L. [R-CO]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Byrd, Harry F., Jr. [I-VA]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Eagleton, Thomas F. [D-MO]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Hawkins, Paula [R-FL]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Hayakawa, Samuel Ichiye [R-CA]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Jepsen, Roger W. [R-IA]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Laxalt, Paul D. [R-NV]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Long, Russell B. [D-LA]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 08/19/1982
Sen. McClure, James A. [R-ID]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Mattingly, Mack [R-GA]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Schmitt, Harrison H. [R-NM]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Tower, John G. [R-TX]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY]* 08/19/1982
Sen. Zorinsky, Edward [D-NE]* 08/19/1982
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 09/13/1982
Sen. Percy, Charles H. [R-IL] 09/13/1982
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 09/14/1982
Sen. Denton, Jeremiah [R-AL] 09/21/1982
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 09/21/1982

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary08/19/1982 Referred to
09/14/1982 Markup by
09/14/1982 Reported by
House Post Office and Civil Service09/20/1982 Referred to
09/30/1982 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.235. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (08/19/1982)

Designates March 21, 1983, as National Agriculture Day.