Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Title as Enacted

A joint resolution designating the week beginning March 7, 1982, as "Women's History Week".

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution designating the week beginning March 8, 1981, as "Women's History Week".


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
08/04/1981Became Public Law No: 97-28.
08/04/1981Signed by President.
07/28/1981Presented to President.
07/24/1981Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendments by Voice vote.
07/15/1981Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
07/15/1981House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/10/1981Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
03/06/1981Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond favorably without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
02/06/1981Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/04/1981Became Public Law No: 97-28.
08/04/1981Signed by President.
07/28/1981SenatePresented to President.
07/27/1981SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
07/24/1981SenateSenate agreed to House amendments by Voice vote.
07/15/1981HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
07/15/1981HouseCalled up by House by Unanimous Consent.
07/15/1981HouseHouse Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/13/1981HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
03/11/1981HouseReferred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
03/10/1981SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
03/06/1981SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 30.
03/06/1981SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond favorably without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
03/06/1981SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/06/1981SenateRead second time and referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (35)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary02/06/1981 Referred to
03/06/1981 Markup by
03/06/1981 Reported by
House Post Office and Civil Service03/11/1981 Referred to
07/15/1981 Discharged from
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population03/13/1981 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.J.Res.28. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/15/1981)

(Measure passed House, amended)

Requests the President to designate the week beginning March 7, 1982, as "Women's History Week."