As of 07/31/2021 text has not been received for S.Res.287 - An original resolution authorizing expenditures by the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

An original resolution authorizing expenditures by the Committee on Environment and Public Works.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
01/28/1982Committee on Environment and Public Works. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Stafford. Without written report.
01/28/1982Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
03/04/1982Committee on Rules. Provisions of measure incorporated into measure S.RES. 333 ordered to be reported.
02/26/1982Committee on Rules. Committee consideration and Mark Up Session held.
02/10/1982Committee on Rules. Hearings held.
01/28/1982Referred to the Committee on Rules.
01/28/1982Committee on Environment and Public Works. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Stafford. Without written report.
01/26/1982Committee on Environment and Public Works ordered to be reported an original measure.

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Rules and Administration01/28/1982 Referred to
02/10/1982 Hearings by
02/26/1982 Markup by
Senate Environment and Public Works01/26/1982 Markup by
01/28/1982 Reported original measure

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Res.287. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/28/1982)

Authorizes expenditures for investigations and studies by the Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works from March 1, 1982, through February 28, 1983, including: (1) employment of personnel; (2) utilization of Federal agency personnel on a reimbursable basis; (3) procurement of consultant services; and (4) training of its professional staff.