Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Jackson, Henry M. [D-WA]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Percy, Charles H. [R-IL]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Goldwater, Barry [R-AZ]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Hart, Gary W. [D-CO]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Weicker, Lowell P., Jr. [R-CT]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Rudman, Warren [R-NH]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Melcher, John [D-MT]* 03/31/1982
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Boschwitz, Rudy [R-MN]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Hayakawa, Samuel Ichiye [R-CA]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Cannon, Howard W. [D-NV]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Andrews, Mark [R-ND]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Tsongas, Paul E. [D-MA]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 03/31/1982
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 04/22/1982
Sen. Randolph, Jennings [D-WV] 04/22/1982
Sen. Eagleton, Thomas F. [D-MO] 04/22/1982
Sen. Chiles, Lawton [D-FL] 06/14/1982
Sen. Stennis, John C. [D-MS] 06/29/1982
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/29/1982
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 06/29/1982
Sen. Stafford, Robert T. [R-VT] 08/03/1982
Sen. Brady, Nicholas [R-NJ] 08/19/1982