Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marriott, David Daniel [R-UT-2]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Lujan, Manuel, Jr. [R-NM-1]* 01/27/1983
Rep. McNulty, James F., Jr. [D-AZ-5]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Breaux, John B. [D-LA-7]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Jones, James R. [D-OK-1]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Kazen, Abraham, Jr. [D-TX-23]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Fuqua, Don [D-FL-2]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Loeffler, Tom [R-TX-21]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11]* 01/27/1983
Rep. Corrada, Baltasar [I-PR-At Large] 02/23/1983
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 02/23/1983
Rep. McCain, John [R-AZ-1] 02/23/1983
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 02/23/1983
Rep. Hall, Katie [D-IN-1] 02/23/1983
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 02/23/1983
Rep. Wright, James C., Jr. [D-TX-12] 02/23/1983
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 02/23/1983
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 02/23/1983
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 03/09/1983
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/09/1983
Rep. Gramm, Phil [D-TX-6] 03/09/1983
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 03/09/1983
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 03/14/1983
Rep. Crane, Daniel B. [R-IL-19] 03/16/1983
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 03/16/1983
Rep. Vandergriff, Tommy J. [D-TX-26] 05/09/1983