Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Washington, Harold [D-IL-1]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/03/1983
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Winn, Larry, Jr. [R-KS-3]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Campbell, Carroll A., Jr. [R-SC-4]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 02/03/1983
Rep. McNulty, James F., Jr. [D-AZ-5]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Long, Clarence D. [D-MD-2]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Minish, Joseph G. [D-NJ-11]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Hall, Katie [D-IN-1]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Roemer, Buddy [D-LA-4]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Vandergriff, Tommy J. [D-TX-26]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-20]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Ferraro, Geraldine A. [D-NY-9]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 02/03/1983
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 04/07/1983
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 04/07/1983
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 04/07/1983
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 04/07/1983
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/07/1983
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 04/07/1983
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 04/07/1983
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 04/07/1983
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 04/07/1983
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 04/07/1983
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 04/07/1983
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 04/07/1983
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 04/07/1983
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 04/07/1983
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 04/07/1983
Rep. Long, Gillis W. [D-LA-8] 04/07/1983
Rep. Chappie, Eugene A. [R-CA-2] 04/07/1983
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 04/07/1983
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 04/07/1983
Rep. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA-5] 04/07/1983
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 04/07/1983
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 04/07/1983
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/07/1983
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 04/07/1983
Rep. Corcoran, Tom [R-IL-14] 04/07/1983
Rep. Pritchard, Joel [R-WA-1] 04/07/1983
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 04/07/1983
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/07/1983
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 04/07/1983
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 04/07/1983
Rep. O'Brien, George M. [R-IL-4] 04/07/1983
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 04/07/1983
Rep. Burton, Phillip [D-CA-5] 04/07/1983
Rep. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN-6] 04/07/1983
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 04/07/1983
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 04/07/1983
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 04/07/1983
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-22] 04/07/1983
Rep. Corrada, Baltasar [I-PR-At Large] 04/07/1983
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 04/07/1983
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 04/07/1983
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 04/07/1983
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 04/07/1983
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 06/28/1983
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 06/28/1983
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 06/28/1983
Rep. Patterson, Jerry M. [D-CA-38] 06/28/1983
Rep. Won Pat, Antonio B. [D-GU-At Large] 06/28/1983
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20] 06/28/1983
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 06/28/1983
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/28/1983
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/28/1983
Rep. Duncan, John J. [R-TN-2] 06/28/1983
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 06/28/1983
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 06/28/1983
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 06/28/1983
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 06/28/1983
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 06/28/1983
Rep. Kramer, Ken [R-CO-5] 06/28/1983
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 07/12/1983
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 11/10/1983
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 11/10/1983
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 11/10/1983
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 11/10/1983
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 11/10/1983
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 11/10/1983
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 11/10/1983
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 11/10/1983
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/14/1984
Rep. McCain, John [R-AZ-1] 03/14/1984
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 03/14/1984
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 03/14/1984
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 03/14/1984
Rep. Hall, Sam B., Jr. [D-TX-1] 03/14/1984
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/14/1984
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 03/14/1984
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 03/14/1984
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 03/14/1984
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 03/14/1984
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 05/30/1984
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 05/30/1984
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 05/30/1984
Rep. Hartnett, Thomas F. [R-SC-1] 05/30/1984
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 05/30/1984
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 05/30/1984
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 05/30/1984
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/30/1984
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 06/19/1984