Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Early, Joseph D. [D-MA-3]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 02/17/1983
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 02/17/1983
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2] 02/17/1983
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 02/17/1983
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 02/17/1983
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 02/17/1983
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 02/17/1983
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 02/17/1983
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 02/17/1983
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 02/17/1983
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/17/1983
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 02/17/1983
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 02/17/1983
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/17/1983
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 02/17/1983
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 02/17/1983
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/17/1983
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 02/17/1983
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 02/17/1983
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 02/17/1983
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 02/17/1983
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 02/17/1983
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 02/17/1983
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 02/17/1983
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 02/17/1983
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 02/17/1983
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 02/17/1983
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/17/1983
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 02/17/1983
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 02/17/1983
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 02/17/1983
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 02/17/1983
Rep. Shannon, James M. [D-MA-5] 02/17/1983
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 02/17/1983
Rep. Smith, Neal Edward [D-IA-4] 02/17/1983
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 02/17/1983
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 02/17/1983
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 02/17/1983
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 02/17/1983
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/17/1983
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/17/1983
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 03/02/1983
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 03/02/1983
Rep. Zablocki, Clement J. [D-WI-4] 03/02/1983
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/02/1983
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 03/02/1983
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 03/02/1983
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/02/1983
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 03/02/1983
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 03/02/1983
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 03/02/1983
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 03/02/1983
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 03/02/1983
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 03/02/1983
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 03/02/1983
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 03/02/1983
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 03/02/1983
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 03/02/1983
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/02/1983
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 03/02/1983
Rep. Harrison, Frank [D-PA-11] 03/02/1983
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/02/1983
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 03/02/1983
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/02/1983
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 03/02/1983
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/02/1983
Rep. Hall, Katie [D-IN-1] 03/02/1983
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 03/02/1983
Rep. Washington, Harold [D-IL-1] 03/02/1983
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 03/02/1983
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 03/16/1983
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 03/16/1983
Rep. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL-7] 03/16/1983
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 03/16/1983
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 03/16/1983
Rep. Ferraro, Geraldine A. [D-NY-9] 03/16/1983
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 03/16/1983
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 03/16/1983
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/11/1983
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 04/11/1983
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 04/11/1983
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 04/11/1983
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 04/11/1983
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 04/11/1983