Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/07/1983
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 05/10/1983
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 05/10/1983
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/10/1983
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3] 05/18/1983
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/18/1983
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 05/18/1983
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 05/18/1983
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 05/18/1983
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/18/1983
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 05/18/1983
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 05/18/1983
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 05/18/1983
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/18/1983
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 05/18/1983
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 05/18/1983
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 05/18/1983
Rep. Pritchard, Joel [R-WA-1] 05/19/1983
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 05/19/1983
Rep. Edwards, Jack [R-AL-1] 05/19/1983
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 05/24/1983
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 05/26/1983
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 05/26/1983
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/26/1983
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 06/03/1983
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/27/1983
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 07/27/1983
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 08/03/1983