Committees: H.R.1400 — 98th Congress (1983-1984)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services02/10/1983 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel and Compensation02/22/1983 Referred to
10/31/1983 Hearings by
House Veterans' Affairs02/10/1983 Referred to
05/10/1983 Markup by
05/16/1983 Reported by H.Rept 98-185 Part 1
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Education, Training and Employment04/12/1983 Referred to
04/12/1983 Hearings by
05/04/1983 Markup by
05/04/1983 Reported by