Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1]* 02/24/1983
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 03/09/1983
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 04/20/1983
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 04/27/1983
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/27/1983
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 04/27/1983
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 04/27/1983
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 04/27/1983
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 04/27/1983
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 04/27/1983
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 04/27/1983
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 04/27/1983
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 04/27/1983
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 04/27/1983
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 05/03/1983
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/03/1983
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-20] 05/03/1983
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/03/1983
Rep. Ferraro, Geraldine A. [D-NY-9] 05/03/1983
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 06/03/1983
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 06/03/1983
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/03/1983
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 06/03/1983
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/03/1983
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 06/03/1983
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 06/03/1983
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6] 06/20/1983
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/21/1983
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 06/21/1983
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 06/21/1983
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 06/29/1983
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 06/29/1983
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 07/13/1983
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 07/13/1983
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 09/14/1983