Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to ratify an exchange agreement concerning National Wildlife Refuge System lands located on Matagorda Island in Texas.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
08/04/1983Became Public Law No: 98-66.
08/04/1983Signed by President.
07/26/1983Presented to President.
07/22/1983Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
07/11/1983Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Chafee without amendment. With written report No. 98-176.
04/19/1983Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
04/18/1983Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. Report No: 98-67.
03/07/1983Introduced in House

All Actions (27)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/04/1983Became Public Law No: 98-66.
08/04/1983Signed by President.
07/26/1983HousePresented to President.
07/26/1983SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
07/22/1983SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
07/11/1983SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 281.
07/11/1983SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Chafee without amendment. With written report No. 98-176.
06/23/1983SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported in lieu of S. 696 without amendment favorably.
05/19/1983SenateSubcommittee on Environmental Pollution. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Environmental Pollution
04/21/1983SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
04/19/1983HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
04/19/1983HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
04/18/1983HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 35.
04/18/1983HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. Report No: 98-67.
04/13/1983HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
04/13/1983HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
04/12/1983HouseExecutive Comment Received From Interior.
04/12/1983HouseFavorable Executive Comment Received From Interior.
04/12/1983HouseUnfavorable Executive Comment Received From Interior.
04/12/1983HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment
04/12/1983HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment
03/17/1983HouseExecutive Comment Received From Interior.
03/14/1983HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
03/14/1983HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
03/09/1983HouseHearings Held by Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment Prior to Referral.
03/07/1983HouseReferred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
03/07/1983HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wright, James C., Jr. [D-TX-12]* 03/07/1983
Rep. Breaux, John B. [D-LA-7]* 03/07/1983
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 03/07/1983

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries03/07/1983 Referred to
03/09/1983 Hearings by
04/13/1983 Markup by
04/18/1983 Reported by H.Rept 98-67
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment03/14/1983 Referred to
04/12/1983 Markup by
04/12/1983 Reported by
Senate Environment and Public Works04/21/1983 Referred to
06/23/1983 Markup by
07/11/1983 Reported by S.Rept 98-176
Senate Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Environmental Pollution05/19/1983 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1935. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/07/1983)

Ratifies an exchange agreement providing for management of National Wildlife Refuge System lands and State park lands on Matagorda Island in Texas.