Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 03/10/1983
Rep. D'Amours, Norman E. [D-NH-1] 03/16/1983
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 03/16/1983
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 03/16/1983
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 03/16/1983
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 03/16/1983
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 03/16/1983
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-20] 03/16/1983
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 03/16/1983
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 03/16/1983
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2] 03/16/1983
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/16/1983
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 03/16/1983
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 03/16/1983
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 04/19/1983
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/19/1983
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 04/19/1983
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 04/19/1983
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 04/19/1983
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 04/19/1983
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 04/19/1983
Rep. Hall, Katie [D-IN-1] 04/19/1983
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 04/19/1983
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 04/19/1983
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/19/1983
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 04/19/1983
Rep. Ratchford, William R. [D-CT-5] 04/19/1983
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 04/19/1983
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 04/19/1983
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 04/19/1983
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 04/19/1983
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 04/19/1983
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 04/19/1983
Rep. Long, Clarence D. [D-MD-2] 04/19/1983
Rep. McKernan, John R., Jr. [R-ME-1] 04/19/1983
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 04/19/1983
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 04/19/1983
Rep. Patterson, Jerry M. [D-CA-38] 04/19/1983
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 04/19/1983
Rep. Shannon, James M. [D-MA-5] 04/19/1983
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/19/1983
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 06/29/1983
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 06/29/1983
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 06/29/1983
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 06/29/1983
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/29/1983
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 06/29/1983
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/29/1983
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/29/1983
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 06/29/1983
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 06/29/1983
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 06/29/1983
Rep. Early, Joseph D. [D-MA-3] 06/29/1983
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/29/1983
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 06/29/1983
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 10/06/1983
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/06/1983
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 10/06/1983