Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN-6]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Albosta, Donald J. [D-MI-10]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Hall, Katie [D-IN-1]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Harkin, Tom [D-IA-5]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Hillis, Elwood H. [R-IN-5]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4]* 03/16/1983
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Latta, Delbert L. [R-OH-5]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/16/1983
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Minish, Joseph G. [D-NJ-11]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-20]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Perkins, Carl Dewey [D-KY-7]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Rostenkowski, Dan [D-IL-8]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-22]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Smith, Neal Edward [D-IA-4]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Taylor, G. [R-MO-7]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2]* 03/16/1983
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 04/07/1983
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 04/07/1983
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 04/07/1983
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 04/07/1983
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/07/1983
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/07/1983
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 04/07/1983
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 04/07/1983
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 04/07/1983
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 04/07/1983
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 04/07/1983
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 04/07/1983
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 04/07/1983
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/07/1983
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 04/07/1983
Rep. Ratchford, William R. [D-CT-5] 04/07/1983
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3] 04/07/1983
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 04/07/1983
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 04/07/1983
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 04/07/1983
Rep. Sawyer, Harold S. [R-MI-5] 04/07/1983
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 04/07/1983
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/28/1983
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 04/28/1983
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 04/28/1983
Rep. D'Amours, Norman E. [D-NH-1] 04/28/1983
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/28/1983
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 04/28/1983
Rep. Zablocki, Clement J. [D-WI-4] 04/28/1983
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 04/28/1983
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 04/28/1983
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 04/28/1983
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 04/28/1983
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 04/28/1983
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 04/28/1983
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/28/1983
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 04/28/1983
Rep. Washington, Harold [D-IL-1] 04/28/1983
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 04/28/1983
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 04/28/1983
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 04/28/1983
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 04/28/1983
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 04/28/1983
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 04/28/1983
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 04/28/1983
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 05/04/1983
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/25/1983
Rep. Shannon, James M. [D-MA-5] 05/25/1983
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8] 05/25/1983
Rep. Ferraro, Geraldine A. [D-NY-9] 05/25/1983
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 05/25/1983
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/25/1983
Rep. Patterson, Jerry M. [D-CA-38] 05/25/1983
Rep. Harrison, Frank [D-PA-11] 05/25/1983
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 05/25/1983
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/25/1983
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 05/25/1983
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/09/1983
Rep. Williams, Lyle [R-OH-17] 06/09/1983
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 06/09/1983
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 06/09/1983
Rep. Long, Clarence D. [D-MD-2] 07/27/1983
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 07/27/1983
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 07/27/1983
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 09/15/1983
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 09/15/1983
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/15/1983
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 09/15/1983
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 09/15/1983
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 09/30/1983
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 09/30/1983
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 09/30/1983
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/06/1983
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 10/06/1983
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/06/1983
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 10/06/1983
Rep. Won Pat, Antonio B. [D-GU-At Large] 10/06/1983
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 10/06/1983
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 10/06/1983
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21] 10/06/1983
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 10/06/1983
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 11/04/1983
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 03/27/1984
Rep. Early, Joseph D. [D-MA-3] 03/27/1984
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2] 03/27/1984
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 04/11/1984

Show cosponsors who withdrew